EP3506598 - METHOD, DEVICE, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM FOR IMPLEMENTING CONTINUOUS SESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/27] | METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM FOR IMPLEMENTING CONTINUOUS SESSION | ||
[2023/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Xiaoyun ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Jinguo ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 17823690.7 | 07.07.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017CN92282 | Priority number, date | CN201610543593 | 08.07.2016 Original published format: CN201610543593 | [2019/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018006878 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3506598 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3506598 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/22, H04W36/14 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
H04W76/22 (EP);
H04W36/0022 (US);
H04L65/40 (US);
H04W36/0016 (US);
H04W36/30 (US);
H04W88/16 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/27] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINER KONTINUIERLICHEN SITZUNG | [2023/28] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM FOR IMPLEMENTING CONTINUOUS SESSION | [2023/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR DE MISE EN OEUVRE DE SESSION CONTINUE | [2023/28] |
Former [2019/27] | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINER KONTINUIERLICHEN SITZUNG | ||
Former [2019/27] | METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM FOR IMPLEMENTING CONTINUOUS SESSION | ||
Former [2019/27] | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE MISE EN OEUVRE DE SESSION CONTINUE | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2019 | Translation filed | 08.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/27] | 08.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 12.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2019/27] | 23.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22154601.3 / EP4087367 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 21.05.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 21.05.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2023 | CZ | 19.07.2023 | DK | 19.07.2023 | EE | 19.07.2023 | FI | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | LT | 19.07.2023 | LV | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SE | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | PT | 20.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 19.07.2023 | |
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - CISCO SYSTEMS ET AL, "Interim agreements on support for session and service continuity and efficient user plane path", vol. SA WG2, no. Vienna, Austria; 20160711 - 20160715, (20160705), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-163410, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_116_Vienna/Docs/, (20160705), XP051121124 [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 5 * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on Architecture for Next Generation System (Release 14)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 23.799, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20160427), vol. SA WG2, no. V0.4.0, pages 1 - 92, XP051123441 [A] 1-15 * page 67 - page 71 * | International search | [A]CN101247637 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2011145419 (SHAHEEN KAMEL M [US], et al) [A] 1-18* , the whole document *; | [YXA]WO2015096012 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 14, 12-15, 18 * , description, page 2, paragraph 4 to page 9, paragraph 4, description, page 2, paragraph 4 to page 9, paragraph 4, description, page 2, paragraph 4 to page 9, paragraph 4 * [X] 5-8, 16 [A] 9-11, 17; | [Y] - CISCO SYSTEMS, INC. et al., "SA WG2 MEETING#114 S2-161979", SYSTEM ENABLERS FOR SESSION AND SERVICE CONTINUITY, (20160414), XP051091937 [Y] 14, 12-15, 18 * , 6. 6.X. 1.3 SESSION AND SERVICE CONTINUITY MODES, SSC mode 3 and 6.6.x. 1.3.4 SSC mode 3 * |