EP3483821 - INFORMATION PRESENTATION DEVICE, INFORMATION PRESENTATION SYSTEM, AND INFORMATION PRESENTATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Koichiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
SHIN, Hidehiko c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
ITOH, Tomoaki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
OKIMOTO, Yoshiyuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
FUKUI, Takayuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 17823914.1 | 02.06.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017JP20559 | Priority number, date | JP20160133623 | 05.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016133623 | [2019/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018008307 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3483821 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G07G1/12 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0205 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US);
G07G1/12 (EP,US);
H04N7/183 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSDARSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSDARSTELLUNGSSYSTEM UND INFORMATIONSDARSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/20] | English: | INFORMATION PRESENTATION DEVICE, INFORMATION PRESENTATION SYSTEM, AND INFORMATION PRESENTATION METHOD | [2019/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉSENTATION D'INFORMATIONS | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2018 | Translation filed | 29.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 06.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/19] | 18.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2136326 (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP]) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0090] *; | [I]JP2015070354 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0097] *; | [I]WO2015025490 (NEC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0103] * | International search | [Y]JP2013210953 (TOSHIBA TEC KK) [Y] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0031] to [0032] & US 2013/0262179 A1 paragraphs [0055] to [0057] *; | [Y]JP2001143184 (HIRANO KATSUYOSHI, et al) [Y] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0002], [0050] to [0051] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2007183857 (NEC INFRONTIA CORP, et al) [Y] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0031] to [0043]; fig. 3 to 4 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2004118453 |