EP3483822 - INFORMATION PRESENTATION DEVICE, INFORMATION PRESENTATION SYSTEM, AND INFORMATION PRESENTATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUI Takayuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
SHIN Hidehiko c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
OKIMOTO Yoshiyuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
ITOH Tomoaki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
YAMAGUCHI Koichiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 17823953.9 | 15.06.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017JP22043 | Priority number, date | JP20160133619 | 05.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016133619 | [2019/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018008346 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3483822 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US);
G06F16/288 (US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSDARSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSDARSTELLUNGSSYSTEM UND INFORMATIONSDARSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/20] | English: | INFORMATION PRESENTATION DEVICE, INFORMATION PRESENTATION SYSTEM, AND INFORMATION PRESENTATION METHOD | [2019/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉSENTATION D'INFORMATIONS, SYSTÈME DE PRÉSENTATION D'INFORMATIONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉSENTATION D'INFORMATIONS | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2018 | Translation filed | 28.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 06.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/18] | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2016004353 (IBM) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0240] *; | [I]US2008294487 (NASSER KAMAL [US]) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0174] * * paragraph [0186] - paragraph [0203] * * paragraph [0214] - paragraph [0218] *; | [I]US5313392 (TEMMA TADASHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-13 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 63 * * column 4, line 62 - column 15, line 51 * * column 19, line 60 - column 24, line 20 * | International search | [XA]JP2013210870 (HITACHI SOLUTIONS LTD) [X] 11 * , paragraphs [0026] to [0059]; fig. 4, 6, 8 (Family: none) * [A] 1-10, 12-13; | [A]JP2012247926 (YAHOO JAPAN CORP, et al) [A] 1-13 * , paragraph [0026]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007257335 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-13 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004118453 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-13 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [PA]JP2016177583 (HITACHI SOLUTIONS LTD) [PA] 1-13 * , entire text; all drawings & WO 2016/152183 A1 *; | [PA]JP2016207059 (HITACHI SOLUTIONS LTD) [PA] 1-13 * , entire text; all drawings & WO 2016/174878 A1 * | [A] - Shintaro Ushimi, "System Shokai, Uriba Kasseika no Tameno Tenpo Layout Tenpo Layout Sakusei Bunseki Shien System = [Store layout for sales floor activation. Store layout creation and analysis support system]", Yuka POWER, (20091210), vol. 250, ISSN 1343-5566, pages 58 - 63, XP009511775 [A] 1-13 | by applicant | JPS5731766B |