EP3483401 - SYSTEM USING COLD ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cytroniq Co., Ltd. Chaam-dong Cheonan Techno Town No. 507 952 Gongdan 2-Ro Seobuk-gu Cheonan-si, Chungcheongnam-do 31075 / KR | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Michael Myung Sub 108-503 41 Seongbulsa-gil Dongnam-gu Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do 31066 / KR | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/20] | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 17824553.6 | 06.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017KR07226 | Priority number, date | KR20160085274 | 06.07.2016 Original published format: KR 20160085274 | [2019/20] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018008997 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3483401 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01K25/10, H01M8/04, H01M8/0606, F01K23/06, H01M8/0612 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
H01M8/0618 (EP,CN);
G06F11/3457 (KR);
F01K23/06 (CN);
F01K23/101 (CN);
F01K25/10 (KR);
F17C13/00 (KR);
G06F11/3419 (KR);
G06F30/28 (KR);
G06N20/00 (KR);
H01M8/0606 (CN);
F17C2221/011 (EP);
F17C2221/012 (EP,KR);
F17C2221/013 (EP);
F17C2221/015 (EP);
F17C2221/033 (EP);
F17C2223/0161 (EP);
F17C2227/03 (EP);
F17C2265/033 (EP);
F17C2265/034 (EP);
F17C2265/05 (EP);
F17C2265/07 (EP);
F17C2270/0105 (EP);
F17C2270/0184 (EP);
G06F2111/06 (KR);
G06F2111/10 (KR);
G06F2113/08 (KR);
G06F2119/08 (KR);
G06F2119/14 (KR);
Y02E60/32 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P90/45 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/20] | F01K25/10, H01M8/04, H01M8/0606, F01K23/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UNTER VERWENDUNG VON KÄLTEENERGIE | [2019/20] | English: | SYSTEM USING COLD ENERGY | [2019/20] | French: | SYSTÈME UTILISANT L'ÉNERGIE FROIDE | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2019 | Translation filed | 05.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 16.08.2019 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 01.10.2019 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 27.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.2021 | 31.07.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004051050 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006090399 (WIKSTROM JON P [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2012108116 (TAKAHIRA TOMOAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]KR20150061276 (DAEWOO SHIPBUILDING & MARINE [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [YA]KR20150061276 (DAEWOO SHIPBUILDING & MARINE [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0001]-[0021], [0037]-[0059]; and figures 1-3. * [A] 16-24; | [Y]JP2004051050 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0020] - and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]JP2002130851 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD) [Y] 4, 15 * See paragraphs [0003], [0022], and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20090015458 (SHINYOUNG HEAVY IND CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0048]-[0057]; and figure 1. *; | [A]JP2015190628 (CHIYODA CORP) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0032]: and figures 1-3. * |