EP3486518 - CENTRIFUGAL CLUTCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. 7000-36 Nakagawa Hosoe-cho Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-1394 / JP | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOMICHI, Yuta c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo 7000-46 Nakagawa Hosoe-cho Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | 02 /
KINE, Yuta c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo 7000-46 Nakagawa Hosoe-cho Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | 03 /
AONO, Kaoru c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo 7000-46 Nakagawa Hosoe-cho Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | 04 /
KATAOKA, Makoto c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo 7000-46 Nakagawa Hosoe-cho Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Sommer, Andrea Andrea Sommer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Uhlandstraße 2 80336 München / DE | [2019/21] | Application number, filing date | 17827393.4 | 26.06.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017JP23386 | Priority number, date | JP20160140425 | 15.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016140425 | [2019/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018012263 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3486518 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3486518 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16D43/18, // F16D43/14 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
F16D43/18 (EP,US);
F16D43/22 (US);
F16D2043/145 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/21] | F16D43/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGALKUPPLUNG | [2019/21] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL CLUTCH | [2019/21] | French: | EMBRAYAGE CENTRIFUGE | [2019/21] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2019 | Translation filed | 31.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 12.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2017 | AL | 17.11.2021 | AT | 17.11.2021 | CY | 17.11.2021 | CZ | 17.11.2021 | DK | 17.11.2021 | EE | 17.11.2021 | FI | 17.11.2021 | HR | 17.11.2021 | LT | 17.11.2021 | LV | 17.11.2021 | MC | 17.11.2021 | MK | 17.11.2021 | MT | 17.11.2021 | NL | 17.11.2021 | PL | 17.11.2021 | RO | 17.11.2021 | RS | 17.11.2021 | SE | 17.11.2021 | SI | 17.11.2021 | SK | 17.11.2021 | SM | 17.11.2021 | TR | 17.11.2021 | BG | 17.02.2022 | NO | 17.02.2022 | GR | 18.02.2022 | IS | 17.03.2022 | PT | 17.03.2022 | GB | 26.06.2022 | IE | 26.06.2022 | LU | 26.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 26.06.2017 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
MK | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
TR | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
GB | 26.06.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 26.06.2017 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
MK | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
GB | 26.06.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 26.06.2017 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
GB | 26.06.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 26.06.2017 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
GB | 26.06.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
GB | 26.06.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 17.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2087968 (DODGE ADIEL Y) [I] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [XI]US3251445 (ZUCK RAY A, et al) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document *[I] 3,5; | [XI]TW201432175 (ZENG YUE HUA [TW]) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 1,2,4,6 * [I] 3,5 | International search | [A]JPS49109752 (Rolf Anders Gunnar Johansson) [A] 1-5* , page 4, lower left column, line 13 to page 6, upper left column, line 9; fig. 1 to 3 & US 3971462 A column 2, line 13 to column 4, line 3; fig. 1 to 3 & DE 2401385 A1 & SE 369544 B & NO 138040 B & FI 57829 B & CA 1040121 A *; | [A]JPS5372047U (Suzuki Motor Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-5 * , specification, page 3, line 9 to page 7, line 5; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS5994624U (Suzuki Motor Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-5 * , specification, page 4, line 7 to page 8, line 9; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0278822U (Honda Motor Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-5 * , specification, page 4, line 14 to page 9, line 8; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP3134915U (Huei Tuan, Chun-Yi Wu, Pei-Hsuan Wu) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0005] to [0011]; fig. 1 to 8 & US 2008/0053783 A1 paragraphs [0007] to [0038]; fig. 1 to 8 & TW 200800715 A *; | [A]JP3168535U (King Zone Corp.) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0032]; fig. 1 to 5 & US 2011/0240433 A1 paragraphs [0021] to [0036]; fig. 1 to 5 & EP 2375093 A2 & DE 202011004617 U1 & TW 201135095 A & IT UD20110002 U1 & AU 2011201472 A1 & FR 2958358 A3 *; | [A]JP2015203429 (FCC KK) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0054]; fig. 1 to 8 & WO 2015/156130 A1 * |