EP3462639 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING/RECEIVING SYNCHRONIZATION SIGNAL AND SYSTEM INFORMATION FOR TERMINAL IN NEW WIRELESS ACCESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KT Corporation 206 Jeongja-dong 90 Buljeong-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13606 / KR | [2019/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Kyujin (Korea Telecom Research Center Umyeon-dong) 151 Taebong-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06763 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Woo-jin (Korea Telecom Research Center Umyeon-dong) 151 Taebong-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06763 / KR | [2019/14] | Representative(s) | Brevalex 56, Boulevard de l'Embouchure B.P. 27519 31075 Toulouse Cedex 2 / FR | [2019/14] | Application number, filing date | 17827948.5 | 12.07.2017 | [2019/14] | WO2017KR07466 | Priority number, date | KR20160089972 | 15.07.2016 Original published format: KR 20160089972 | KR20170087597 | 11.07.2017 Original published format: KR 20170087597 | [2019/14] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018012878 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3462639 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3462639 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04W56/00 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
H04W56/0015 (EP,US);
H04B7/2643 (KR);
H04B7/2615 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/2621 (KR);
H04L5/0094 (US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W80/08 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/14] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN/EMPFANGEN EINES SYNCHRONISATIONSSIGNALS UND SYSTEMINFORMATIONEN FÜR EIN ENDGERÄT IN EINEM NEUEN DRAHTLOSZUGANGSNETZWERK | [2019/14] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING/RECEIVING SYNCHRONIZATION SIGNAL AND SYSTEM INFORMATION FOR TERMINAL IN NEW WIRELESS ACCESS NETWORK | [2019/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DESTINÉS À ÉMETTRE/À RECEVOIR UN SIGNAL DE SYNCHRONISATION ET DES INFORMATIONS SYSTÈME POUR UN TERMINAL DANS UN NOUVEAU RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS SANS FIL | [2019/14] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2018 | Translation filed | 28.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/14] | 09.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23184015.8 / EP4250830 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Licencee: | Pegasus Wireless Innovation LLC 20319 Kiawah Island Drive Ashburn VA 20147 / US | Date: | 21.07.2023 | [2023/35] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008205351 (LINDOFF BENGT [SE], et al) [X] 1,6,11 * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0054] * * figures 3A-3B * [I] 3-5,8-10,13-15; | [A]US2016191216 (MA JIANGLEI [CA], et al) [A] 1,6,11 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] ** paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] *; | [XI] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Forward compatibility for new radio interface", vol. RAN WG1, no. Busan, Korea; 20160411 - 20160415, (20160402), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-162381 FORWARD COMPATIBILITY FOR NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_84b/Docs/, (20160402), XP051080160 [X] 1,2,6,7,11,12 * page 1, paragraph 3 Numerology * [I] 3-5,8-10,13-15 | [XI] - SAMSUNG, "Proposed set of numerologies for NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160513), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-163998 PROPOSED SET OF NUMEROLOGIES FOR NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160513), XP051090303 [X] 1,2,6,7,11,12 * page 2, paragraph 2 Numerology sets for NR * [I] 3-5,8-10,13-15 | International search | [A]US2015131560 (VON ELBWART ALEXANDER GOLITSCHEK EDLER [DE], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0071], [0142]-[0144], and claim 1. *; | [Y]US2016191216 (MA JIANGLEI [CA], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0038]; claim 1; and figures 5-8. *; | [Y] - "Forward Compatibility for New Radio Interface", R1-162381, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #84bis, Busan, Korea, (20160402), XP051080160 [Y] 1-20 * See sections 2-3. * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Framework for Multiplexing Verticals in NR", R1-164001, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #85, Nanjing, China, (20160513), XP051090301 [A] 1-20 * See sections 1, 3. * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Proposed Set of Numerologies for NR", Rl-163998, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #85, Nanjing, China, (20160513), XP051090303 [A] 1-20 * See section 2. * |