EP3485679 - LOW-POWER WAKE-UP RECEIVER NEGOTIATION PROCEDURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2021/30] |
Former [2019/21] | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Po-Kai San Ramon, California 94582 / US | 02 /
PARK, Minyoung 108 Pearlgrass Court San Ramon, California 94582 / US | [2024/43] |
Former [2019/21] | 01 /
HUANG, Po-Kai 1281 Marcello Drive San Jose, California 95131 / US | ||
02 /
PARK, Minyoung 108 Pearlgrass Court San Ramon, California 94582 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/21] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17828136.6 | 13.06.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017US37304 | Priority number, date | US201662361624P | 13.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662361624 P | US201615376360 | 12.12.2016 Original published format: US201615376360 | [2019/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018013279 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3485679 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04W84/12 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
H04W52/0229 (EP,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Title | German: | VERHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN EMPFÄNGER MIT NIEDRIGER AUFWACHLEISTUNG | [2019/21] | English: | LOW-POWER WAKE-UP RECEIVER NEGOTIATION PROCEDURE | [2019/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE NÉGOCIATION DE RÉCEPTEUR DE RÉVEIL À FAIBLE PUISSANCE | [2019/21] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 30.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014112229 (MERLIN SIMONE [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2014126442 (JAFARIAN AMIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * See paragraphs [0034], [0061], [0065], [0068], [0072], [0088], [0104]-[0105], [0121], [0126]-[0129], [0137]; claims 4, 10, 11; and figures 1, 2, 9. *; | [Y]US2014208135 (KEIL SHANE J [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * See paragraphs [0048]-[0049]; claims 2, 3; and figure 6. *; | [A]US9100813 (LOVICH VITALI [CA], et al) [A] 1-23 * See column 21, line 14 - column 22, line 37; claims 1, 6, 7; and figures 8-10. *; | [A]US2016014773 (SEOK YONGHO [KR]) [A] 1-23* See paragraphs [0073]-[0090]; claim 1; and figure 5. *; | [A]US2016112954 (AMIZUR YUVAL [IL], et al) [A] 1-23 * See paragraphs [0056]-[0058]; claims 1, 4; and figure 6. * | by applicant | US2014112229 |