EP3544417 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INTRODUCING A HIGH VOLTAGE INTO A SUBSTRATE WHICH COMPRISES BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zasso GmbH Pascalstraße 12 52076 Aachen / DE | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBERIUS, Matthias Schubertstraße 1a 52146 Würselen / DE | 02 /
DE ANDRADE COUTINHO FILHO, Sergio Av. Brasil 658, Helvetia 13337-414 Indaiatuba / BR | 03 /
VANDENHIRTZ, Dirk Am Berg 22 52076 Aachen-Kornelimünster / DE | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Castell, Klaus Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann-Castell Oberstraße 135 52349 Düren / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | Castell, Klaus Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann-Castell Am Rurufer 2 52349 Düren / DE | Application number, filing date | 17828835.3 | 27.11.2017 | [2019/40] | WO2017DE00403 | Priority number, date | DE20161014057 | 25.11.2016 Original published format: DE102016014057 | [2019/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018095450 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3544417 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01M21/04, A01G7/04, A01B47/00 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
A01M21/046 (EP);
A01G7/04 (EP,US);
A01B47/00 (EP);
A01D82/02 (US);
H01R3/00 (US);
A01B69/008 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINBRINGEN VON HOCHSPANNUNG IN EIN SUBSTRAT, DAS BIOLOGISCHES MATERIAL AUFWEIST | [2019/40] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INTRODUCING A HIGH VOLTAGE INTO A SUBSTRATE WHICH COMPRISES BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL | [2019/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR APPLIQUER UNE HAUTE TENSION DANS UN SUBSTRAT QUI PRÉSENTE DU MATÉRIEL BIOLOGIQUE | [2019/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 25.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/20] | 11.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007383 (OPP FRED W) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]US2243891 (RUSSELL TOPEL, et al) [Y] 12 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2015027040 (REDDEN LEE [US]) [Y] 6,8,11 * paragraph [0042]; figures 11a,11b *; | [XYI]WO2016028506 (LISI GLOBAL LLC [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * figures 1,2,6,7; claims 30,31 * [Y] 6,8,11,12 [I] 4,5,7,13 |