EP3487283 - PLANT STEM SEPARATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 9354-7453 Québec Inc. 675 montée Saint-François Laval, Québec H7C 2S8 / CA | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHURIN, Mario 110 rue Saint-Pierre St-Jean-sur-Richelieu, Québec J3B 5V9 / CA | 02 /
SOUMIS-PILON, Hubert 1395 chemin des Patriotes Ouest St-Jean-sur-Richelieu, Québec J2Y 1H4 / CA | 03 /
WARD, Carmen 210 rue Bell Massy, Ontario P0P 1P0 / CA | [2020/11] |
Former [2019/22] | 01 /
MATHURIN, Mario 110 rue Saint-Pierre St-Jean-sur-Richelieu Québec J3B 5V9 / CA | ||
02 /
SOUMIS-PILON, Hubert 1395 chemin des Patriotes Ouest St-Jean-sur-Richelieu Québec J2Y 1H4 / CA | |||
03 /
WARD, Carmen 210 rue Bell Massy Ontario P0P 1P0 / CA | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17830158.6 | 21.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017CA50879 | Priority number, date | US201662365438P | 22.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662365438 P | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018014135 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3487283 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 25.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01G7/00, A01G3/00, A01G5/00, A23N15/00, A23N15/02 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
A01G5/00 (EP,US);
A01G3/00 (EP,US);
A01G3/033 (US);
A23N15/00 (EP,US);
A23N15/02 (EP,US);
A01G2003/005 (EP,US);
A01G2003/023 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | A01G7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Title | German: | TRENNVORRICHTUNG FÜR PFLANZENSTÄNGEL | [2019/22] | English: | PLANT STEM SEPARATING APPARATUS | [2019/22] | French: | APPAREIL DE SÉPARATION DE TIGE DE PLANTE | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 06.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2010175355 (DESMARAIS KERRY T [US], et al) [X] 15 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0027] * [A] 4,16,17 [I] 1-3,5-14; | [A]CA2665876 (MAHEU JOEL [CA], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0383410 (KOENDERS ROBER HERMANUS WILHEL) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US3765424 (MORRISON J, et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [XY]CA2665876 (MAHEU JOEL [CA], et al) [X] 1, 2, 4-12, 18, 23-32, 34, 46, 48-52, 54-57, 59-61, and 63-65 *Whole Document* [Y] 33, 35 and 66; | [X]US2010175355 (DESMARAIS KERRY T [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 5, 11-20, 25-31, 42-46, 48-50, 55, 56, 59-61, 63 and 65 *Whole Document*; | [Y]EP0383410 (KOENDERS ROBER HERMANUS WILHEL) [Y] 33, 35 and 66 *Whole Document* |