EP3487970 - METHOD OF PRODUCTION OF FLOWABLE CRUDE MICROBIAL OIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/22] | FLOWABLE CRUDE MICROBIAL OIL AND METHOD OF PRODUCTION | ||
[2022/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mara Renewables Corporation 101 Research Drive Dartmouth, Nova Scotia B2Y 4T6 / CA | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Xuan 101 Research Drive Dartmouth Nova Scotia B2Y 4T6 / CA | 02 /
DENNIS, Dorothy 101 Research Drive Dartmouth Nova Scotia B2Y 4T6 / CA | 03 /
ARMENTA, Roberto E. 101 Research Drive Dartmouth Nova Scotia B2Y 4T6 / CA | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2023/14] |
Former [2019/22] | Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17830588.4 | 20.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017IB54411 | Priority number, date | US201662364455P | 20.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662364455 P | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018015925 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3487970 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3487970 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 25.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C11B3/16, C11B1/00, C11B3/00, C12N1/10, C12P7/64 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
C11B1/10 (EP,US);
C12N1/26 (US);
C07C7/10 (US);
C11B1/02 (EP,US);
C12N1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VOM FLIESSFÄHIGEN MIKROBIELLEN ROHÖL | [2022/44] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCTION OF FLOWABLE CRUDE MICROBIAL OIL | [2022/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE HUILE MICROBIENNE BRUTE FLUIDE | [2022/44] |
Former [2019/22] | FLIESSFÄHIGES MIKROBIELLES ROHÖL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2019/22] | FLOWABLE CRUDE MICROBIAL OIL AND METHOD OF PRODUCTION | ||
Former [2019/22] | HUILE MICROBIENNE BRUTE FLUIDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 24.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | IT | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IE | 20.07.2023 | LU | 20.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
LU | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
LU | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
LU | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
SE | 05.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9408467 (OMEGATECH INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2016102328 (PARK JOONG MIN [KR], et al) [X] 1,13,14 * paragraphs 3 and 45; example 1; claims 1-12 * [I] 1-15; | [A] - SESHAGIRI RAGHUKUMAR, "Thraustochytrid Marine Protists: Production of PUFAs and Other Emerging Technologies", MARINE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20081220), vol. 10, no. 6, doi:10.1007/s10126-008-9135-4, ISSN 1436-2228, pages 631 - 640, XP055136087 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10126-008-9135-4 | International search | [Y]US4889740 (PRICE JUDITH E [US]) [Y] 1-22 * (See entire document) *; | [Y]US2015176042 (DENNIS DOROTHY A [CA], et al) [Y] 1-22* (See entire document) * | by applicant | US4889740 | US2015176042 | US2016102328 |