EP3463308 - FORMULATIONS OF POLYALKYLENE OXIDE-ASPARAGINASE AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Servier IP UK Limited Sefton House Sefton Park Bells Hill Stoke Poges Slough SL2 4JS / GB | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORNASINI, Gianfranco 8501 Old Seven Locks Road Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | 02 /
SOUKHAREVA, Nadejda 7421 Mahaska Drive Derwood, MD 20855 / US | 03 /
PHILLIPS, Christopher 5823 Ridgeview Drive Doylestown, PA 18902 / US | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2021/48] |
Former [2019/15] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17831465.4 | 01.06.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US35461 | Priority number, date | US201662344256P | 01.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662344256 P | US201662344249P | 01.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662344249 P | US201662344252P | 01.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662344252 P | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018017190 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3463308 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3463308 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/19, A61K9/00, A61K47/02, A61K47/26, A61K47/40, A61K38/50, A61K47/60, A61K47/69, A61P35/04 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
A61K38/50 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/19 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K9/08 (KR);
A61K47/02 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K47/26 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K47/40 (EP,IL);
A61K47/542 (IL,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/6921 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (KR);
A61P35/02 (KR);
A61P35/04 (EP,IL,US);
C12N9/82 (RU);
C12N9/96 (RU);
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | A61K9/19 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN VON POLYALKYLEN-OXID-ASPARAGINASE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/15] | English: | FORMULATIONS OF POLYALKYLENE OXIDE-ASPARAGINASE AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME | [2019/15] | French: | FORMULATIONS D'OXYDE DE POLYALKYLÈNE-ASPARAGINASE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 15.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21211264.3 / EP4019007 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.08.2022
05.09.2022
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/41] |
Former [2022/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.08.2022
Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | 13.09.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.01.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.11.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 02.01.2024 | Appeal received No. T0011/24 | 02.01.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 26.03.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN102138909B (CHANGZHOU QIANHONG BIOPHARMA CO LTD); | International search | [Y]US4179337 (DAVIS FRANK F [US], et al); | [Y]EP0893439 (ENZON INC [US]); | [Y]US2010143324 (MONONEN ILKKA [FI], et al); | [YA]US2015224207 (KOZLOWSKI ANTONI [US], et al); | [XYA]US2016060613 (ABRIBAT THIERRY [FR]) | by applicant | US4179337 | US5122614 | US5200534 | US5202448 | WO9310076 | US5229529 | WO9323555 | US5274137 | US5279949 | US5283253 | US5294637 | EP0590267 | WO9407882 | WO9407881 | WO9407880 | WO9407876 | US5324844 | US5415869 | WO9614856 | WO9633212 | US5612460 | WO9813059 | WO9822451 | WO9828288 | US5821263 | US5824701 | WO9858927 | US5869680 | WO9909021 | WO9914209 | WO9918113 | US6323315 | EP1391213 | EP0893439 | US2010143324 | CN102138909 | US2015224207 | US2016060613 | Opposition | US4179337 | EP0893439 | WO9948535 | US6180095 | US2010143324 | WO2011003886 | CN102138909 | RU2441914 | US2015224207 | US2016060613 |