EP3484569 - GUIDEWIRE DEVICES HAVING SHAPEABLE TIPS AND BYPASS CUTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scientia Vascular, Inc. 3487 West 2100 South, Suite 100 West Valley City, UT 84119 / US | [2022/42] |
Former [2019/21] | For all designated states Scientia Vascular, LLC 3487 West 2100 South Suite 100 West Valley City, UT 84119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIPPERT, John A. 9006 Jeremy Circle Park City, Utah 84098 / US | 02 /
SNYDER, Edward J. 8559 Southridge Drive Park City, Utah 84098 / US | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Hepworth Browne 15 St. Pauls Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/21] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17831568.5 | 10.07.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017US41299 | Priority number, date | US201662363760P | 18.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662363760 P | US201715606607 | 26.05.2017 Original published format: US201715606607 | [2019/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018017349 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3484569 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/09, A61M25/00, A61L31/02, A61L31/18 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
A61M25/09 (EP,KR,US);
A61M25/09016 (CN);
A61L31/022 (EP,KR,US);
A61L31/04 (KR);
A61L31/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2025/09075 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09083 (KR,US);
A61M2025/09091 (US);
A61M2025/09133 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61M2025/09141 (US);
A61M2025/0915 (KR,US);
A61M2025/09166 (CN,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61M2210/12, A61M2210/005 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2019/21] | A61M25/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSDRAHTVORRICHTUNGEN MIT FORMBAREN SPITZEN UND BYPASS-SCHNITTEN | [2019/21] | English: | GUIDEWIRE DEVICES HAVING SHAPEABLE TIPS AND BYPASS CUTS | [2019/21] | French: | DISPOSITIFS FILS-GUIDES POURVUS D'UNE POINTE PROFILABLE ET D'ENTAILLES DE DÉRIVATION | [2019/21] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 16.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014066104 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US]); | [XI]US2014276109 (GREGORICH DANIEL J [US]); | [A]US2015306355 (IDSTROM MARK EDMAN [US]) | International search | [A]US5876356 (VIERA FERNANDO M [US], et al); | [A]US7276062 (MCDANIEL BENJAMIN D [US], et al); | [YA]US2008188928 (SALAHIEH AMR [US], et al); | [Y]US2009177119 (HEIDNER MATT [US], et al); | [A]US2010256528 (LIPPERT JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US7878984 (JACOBSEN STEPHEN C [US], et al); | [XYA]US2016199620 (POKORNEY JAMES [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2004011076 | US2009118675 | US2009254000 |