EP3559036 - ANTI-HUMAN CXCR3 ANTIBODIES FOR TREATMENT OF VITILIGO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | For all designated states The University of Massachusetts One Beacon Street 31st Floor Boston, MA 02108 / US | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRONDYK, William, H. c/o Sanofi 55 Corporate Drive Mail Code: 55A-505A Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 02 /
CHU, Ruiyin c/o Sanofi 55 Corporate Drive Mail Code: 55A-505A Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 03 /
CONNORS, Timothy, D. c/o Sanofi 55 Corporate Drive Mail Code: 55A-505A Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 04 /
PARK, Sunghae c/o Sanofi 55 Corporate Drive Mail Code: 55A-505A Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 05 /
QIU, Huawei c/o Sanofi 55 Corporate Drive Mail Code: 55A-505A Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 06 /
YOUD, Michele c/o Sanofi 55 Corporate Drive Mail Code: 55A-505A Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 07 /
HARRIS, John c/o University of Massachusetts One Beacon Street 31st Floor Boston, MA 02108 / US | 08 /
RICHMOND, Jillian c/o University Of Massachusetts One Beacon Street 31st Floor Boston, MA 02108 / US | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 17832143.6 | 21.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017US67988 | Priority number, date | US201662437889P | 22.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662437889 P | EP20170306770 | 14.12.2017 Original published format: EP 17306770 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018119288 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3559036 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61P17/00, A61P37/00 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
C07K16/2866 (EP,KR);
A61P17/00 (EP,KR);
A61P37/00 (EP,KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/14 (KR);
C07K2317/24 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/41 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/52 (KR);
C07K2317/56 (KR);
C07K2317/565 (KR);
C07K2317/72 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/732 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | ANTI-HUMAN-CXCR3-ANTIKÖRPER ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VITILIGO | [2019/44] | English: | ANTI-HUMAN CXCR3 ANTIBODIES FOR TREATMENT OF VITILIGO | [2019/44] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-CXCR3 HUMAINS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU VITILIGO | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 28.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 01.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007048122 (GENZYME CORP [US], et al) [A] 13-15,28-30 * the whole document * * in particular pages 6 and 16 *; | [A]WO2008094942 (COGENESYS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * the whole document * * in particular pages 2-9 *; | [A]WO2013109974 (GENZYME CORP [US]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document * * in particular, examples 8 and 13 and figure 22 *; | [A]WO2014186842 (UNIV MONASH [AU]) [A] 1-32 * in particular, pages 21-29, §20 on page 8 and §86 on page 28 *; | [A]US2016053013 (SWANSON BARBARA A [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * the whole document * * in particular, pages 1-10 *; | [I] - Mauro Picardo ET AL, "Vitiligo International Symposium Rome 2-3 December 2016", doi:10.1034/j.1600-0781.2003.00321.x, (20161203), URL: http://www.vis2016.org/pdf/Programma_VIS.pdf, (20180302), XP055456015 [I] 1-32 * page 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1600-0781.2003.00321.x | [ ] - ANONYMOUS, "Vitiligo International Symposium 2016", PIGMENT CELL & MELANOMA RESEARCH, (20170207), vol. 30, no. 5, page e1, XP055456011 | [A] - John Harris, "Targeting IFN gamma and chemokines to treat vitiligo in a humanized mouse model", (2015), URL: http://grantome.com/grant/NIH/K08-AR061437-04, (20180302), XP055456002 [A] 1-32 * the whole document * * in particular page 2 * | [A] - X. X. WANG ET AL, "Increased expression of CXCR3 and its ligands in patients with vitiligo and CXCL10 as a potential clinical marker for vitiligo", BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, UK, (20160601), vol. 174, no. 6, doi:10.1111/bjd.14416, ISSN 0007-0963, pages 1318 - 1326, XP055455885 [A] 1-32 * the whole document * * in particular, apge 1323 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/bjd.14416 | [A] - WANG XIUXIU ET AL, "Increased expression of CXCR3 and its ligands in vitiligo patients and its role as potential clinical markers for vitiligo", JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGICAL SCIENCE, (20160604), vol. 84, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JDERMSCI.2016.08.306, ISSN 0923-1811, XP029754327 [A] 1-32 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jdermsci.2016.08.306 | [A] - M. RASHIGHI ET AL, "CXCL10 Is Critical for the Progression and Maintenance of Depigmentation in a Mouse Model of Vitiligo", SCIENCE TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, (20140212), vol. 6, no. 223, doi:10.1126/scitranslmed.3007811, ISSN 1946-6234, pages 223ra23 - 223ra23, XP055152548 [A] 1-32 * the whole document * * in particular, pages 7-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.3007811 | [A] - MOORE GREGORY L ET AL, "Engineered Fc variant antibodies with enhanced ability to recruit complement and mediate effector functions", 20100301, (20100301), vol. 2, no. 2, doi:10.4161/MABS.2.2.11158, ISSN 1942-0862, pages 181 - 189, XP009143498 [A] 3-6,8-12,18-21,23-27 * the whole document * * in particular, pages 182-185 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.2.2.11158 | [A] - LAZAR G A ET AL, "Engineered antibody Fc variants with enhanced effector function", PROCEEDINGS NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES PNAS, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20060301), vol. 103, no. 11, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0508123103, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4005 - 4010, XP002403708 [A] 3-6,8-12,18-21,23-27 * the whole document * * in particular, page 4005 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0508123103 | [T] - RICHMOND JILLIAN M ET AL, "CXCR3 Depleting Antibodies Prevent and Reverse Vitiligo in Mice.", THE JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY APR 2017, (201704), vol. 137, no. 4, ISSN 1523-1747, pages 982 - 985, XP002778748 [T] * the whole document * | by applicant | US5565332 | US5589205 | US6180370 | US6193980 | US6632927 | US2004236078 | US7241877 | US7244615 | US7244832 | US7262050 | WO2009032661 | US2010061983 | US8071336 | WO2013109974 | US8865870 | - UNO et al., Endocr J, (20100000), vol. 57, pages 991 - 996 | - ROEP et al., Clin Exp Immunol, (20030000), vol. 159, pages 338 - 343 | - TANAKA et al., Diabetes, (20090000), vol. 58, pages 2285 - 2291 | - MORIMOTO et al., J Immunol, (20040000), vol. 173, pages 7017 - 7024 | - LI et al., World J Gastroenterol, (20050000), vol. 11, no. 30, pages 4750 - 4752 | - SARKAR et al., Diabetes, (20120000), vol. 61, no. 2, pages 436 - 446 | - ROTTMAN et al., Lab Invest, (20010000), vol. 81, no. 3, pages 335 - 347 | - CHEN et al., Arch Dermatol Res, (20100000), vol. 302, no. 2, pages 113 - 123 | - FRIGERIO, Nat Med, (20020000), vol. 8, pages 1414 - 1420 | - CHRISTEN et al., J Immunol, (20030000), vol. 171, pages 6838 - 6845 | - VAN HALTEREN, Diabetologia, (20050000), vol. 48, pages 75 - 82 | - ALTSCHUL, SF et al., J Mol Biol, (19900000), vol. 215, page 403 | - PEARSON et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444 | - JONES et al., Nature, (19860000), vol. 321, page 522 | - VERHOEYEN et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 239, page 1534 | - SIMS et al., J Immunol, (19930000), vol. 151, page 2296 | - CHOTHIA; LESK, J Mol Biol, (19870000), vol. 196, page 901 | - CARTER et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19920000), vol. 89, page 4285 | - PRESTA et al., J Immunol, (19930000), vol. 151, page 2623 | - COLVIN et al., Mol Cell Biol, (20060000), vol. 26, pages 5838 - 5849 | - RIDGWAY, A. A. G., Mammalian Expression Vectors, Butterworths, (19880000), pages 470 - 472 | - STINCHCOMB et al., Nature, (19790000), vol. 282, page 39 | - KINGSMAN et al., Gene, (19790000), vol. 7, page 141 | - TSCHEMPER et al., Gene, (19800000), vol. 10, page 157 | - JONES, Genetics, (19770000), vol. 85, page 12 | - UPPALURI et al., Transplantation, (20080000), vol. 86, pages 137 - 147 | - "A Turbidimetric Method to Determine Visual Appearances of Protein Solutions", Brigitte Eckhardt, Technology Applications, (19940300), vol. 48, no. 2 | - HARRIS et al., J. Invest. Dermatol., (20120000), vol. 132, pages 1869 - 1876 | - AGARWAL et al., J. Invest. Dermatol., (20150000), vol. 135, pages 1080 - 1088 |