EP3732843 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING AUTHENTICATION AND/OR AUTHORIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlueID GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Str. 15 80807 München / DE | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖMER, Kai Joseph-Kroiss-Str.9 93102 Pfatter / DE | 02 /
SPANGENBERG, Philipp Paul Marie-Juchacz-Str. 76 86154 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
SCHMID, Andreas Helene-Mayer-Ring 14 80809 München / DE | 04 /
WAHLER, Maximilian Karl-Breu-Weg 50 81829 München / DE | [2020/48] |
Former [2020/45] | 01 /
RÖMER, Kai Münchner Str. 101a 85774 Unterföhring / DE | ||
02 /
SPANGENBERG, Philipp Paul Kaltenmoserstr. 5 81479 München / DE | |||
03 /
SCHMID, Andreas Helene-Mayer-Ring 14 80809 München / DE | |||
04 /
WAHLER, Maximilian Baierbrunner Str. 81 81379 München / DE | Representative(s) | Karl, Christof Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 17832245.9 | 28.12.2017 | [2020/45] | WO2017EP84756 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019129351 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3732843 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04W12/06, H04W12/08 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
H04L63/0823 (EP);
H04W12/06 (EP);
H04W12/08 (EP);
H04W12/43 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG UND / ODER AUTORISIERUNG | [2020/45] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING AUTHENTICATION AND/OR AUTHORIZATION | [2020/45] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR UNE AUTHENTIFICATION ET/OU UNE AUTORISATION | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 27.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/29] | 18.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2005010685 (CORESTREET LTD [US], et al) [I] 1-13,20-29,36-40,44-55,60-81,88-97,104-108,112-123,128,129* page 36, line 17 - page 43, line 23; figure 7 *; | [I]US2009183541 (SADIGHI BABAK [SE], et al) [I] 1-13,20-29,36-40,44-55,60-81,88-97,104-108,112-123,128,129 * paragraph [0014]; figure 7 * * paragraphs [0126] - [0130] * * paragraphs [0182] - [0190] *; | [XYI]DE102015216630 (BAIMOS TECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9,12,21-25,28,37,44-55,61-77,80,89-93,96,105,108,112-123,128,129 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0030]; figure 1 * [Y] 14-19,30-35,41-43,56-59,82-87,98-103,109-111,124-127 [I] 10,11,13,20,25-27,29,36,38-40,60,78,79,81,88,94,95,97,104,106,107; | [Y]EP3244568 (ROGAINFORMATIKA S R O [SK]) [Y] 14-19,30-35,41-43,56-59,82-87,98-103,109-111,124-127 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraphs [0061] - [0079] * * figure 2 * | by applicant | US4405829 | EP1910134 |