EP3560194 - COOLING SYSTEM FOR SPATIAL LIGHT MODULATING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barco N.V. President Kennedypark 35 8500 Kortrijk / BE | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALFAIT, Bart Cecile Pieter Ingelmunstersestraat 14 B-8860 Lendelede / BE | 02 /
CLEENEWERCK-DE-CRAYENCOUR, Simon Hansbekedorp 68 9850 Hansbeke / BE | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | IPLodge bv Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | IPLodge bvba Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | Application number, filing date | 17832773.0 | 19.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017EP83637 | Priority number, date | GB20160022220 | 23.12.2016 Original published format: GB 201622220 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018115007 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3560194 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/31, G03B21/16, G02B7/00 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
H04N9/3144 (EP,US);
G02B26/0833 (EP);
G02B5/003 (EP);
G02B7/008 (EP,US);
G03B21/005 (EP,US);
G03B21/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | KÜHLSYSTEM FÜR RÄUMLICHE LICHTMODULATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2019/44] | English: | COOLING SYSTEM FOR SPATIAL LIGHT MODULATING DEVICES | [2019/44] | French: | SYSTÈME DE REFROIDISSEMENT DESTINÉ À DES DISPOSITIFS DE MODULATION SPATIALE DE LUMIÈRE | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 23.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 15.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005030485 (OKETANI KAZUNOBU [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] * * paragraph [0024] * * figure 1 *; | [XY]US2009046255 (KATO HISAMARO [JP]) [X] 1,12,17-20,27-32,35 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] * * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0060] * * figures 1, 2 * [Y] 2-11,21-26; | [Y]US7938543 (GERETS PETER [BE], et al) [Y] 23-26 * abstract * * column 11, line 22 - column 12, line 15 ** figure 1 *; | [Y]EP2506573 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 4-11,21,22 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0030] * * figure 1 * |