EP3491198 - EMBEDDED ANCHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiangsu Ernest Technology Co Ltd No.215 Mudan Jiang Road Huai Yin District Huaian, Jiangsu 361006 / CN | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Desheng 903 Building 4 Mingfa Interational City Wenxing East Wuli Siming District Xiamen Fujian 361006 / CN | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Purdylucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17833550.1 | 26.07.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017CN94427 | Priority number, date | CN201620794350U | 26.07.2016 Original published format: CN 201620794350 U | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018019247 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3491198 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/41, F16B39/04 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
E04B1/415 (EP,EA);
E04B1/4114 (US);
F16B7/042 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/23] | E04B1/41 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Title | German: | EINGEBETTETER ANKER | [2019/23] | English: | EMBEDDED ANCHOR | [2019/23] | French: | ANCRE INTÉGRÉE | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 21.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR20110001734U (WOOJEON GREEN CO LTD) [X] 1,4,5,11,12,14,15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026]; figures 4-6 * [I] 2,3,6-10,13; | [A]CN103410254 (STAN TECHNOLOGY HANGZHOU CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15* figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2014026515 (ESPINOSA THOMAS M [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0066]; figures 1-25 * | International search | [XY]KR20110001734U (WOOJEON GREEN CO LTD) [X] 1-5, 8-18 * description, paragraphs [0013]-[0034] and figures 1-8description, paragraphs [0013]-[0034] and figures 1-8 * [Y] 6, 7; | [Y]CN103410254 (STAN TECHNOLOGY HANGZHOU CO LTD, et al) [Y] 6, 7 * description, paragraph [0024] and figures 1-2 *; | [A]JP5696834B (KANSAI INTERNANCE KK) [A] 1-18* the whole dccument *; | [PX]CN205954859U (DEKA TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-18 * claims 1-18 * |