EP3491917 - APPARATUS FOR PREVENTING ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR IN ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidad De Cádiz (Otri) C/ Ancha 16 11001 Cádiz / ES | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIENVENIDO BARCENA, Rafael Dpto. Ingeniería Mecánica y Diseño Industrial Escuela Politecnica Superior Avda. Universidad de Cádiz n° 10 11519 Puerto Real (Cádiz) / ES | 02 /
RODRIGUEZ PARADA, Maria Lucia Dpto. Maquinas y Motores Termicos Escuela Superior de Ingeniería Avda. Universidad de Cádiz n° 10 11519 Puerto Real (Cádiz) / ES | 03 /
BENITEZ VARGAS, Alfredo Zootécnica Jerezana Polígono Industrial Jerezana - C/Eje 1 11405 Jerez de la Frontera (Cádiz) / ES | 04 /
RODRÍGUEZ PÉREZ, Francisco Zootécnica Jerezana Polígono Industrial Jerezana - C/Eje 1 11405 Jerez de la Frontera (Cádiz) / ES | 05 /
LLAMAS PIÑERO, Rogelio Zootécnica Jerezana Polígono Industrial Jerezana - C/Eje 1 11405 Jerez de la Frontera (Cádiz) / ES | 06 /
LLAMAS PIÑERO, José Manuel Zootécnica Jerezana Polígono Industrial Jerezana - C/Eje 1 11405 Jerez de la Frontera (Cádiz) / ES | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | Pons Glorieta Ruben Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 17833627.7 | 26.07.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017ES00098 | Priority number, date | ES20160000668 | 29.07.2016 Original published format: ES 201600668 | [2019/23] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018020063 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | ES | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3491917 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 01.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01K25/00, A01K27/00 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
A01K25/00 (EP);
A01K27/001 (EP,ES);
A01K27/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON ANTISOZIALEM VERHALTEN BEI TIEREN | [2019/23] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PREVENTING ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR IN ANIMALS | [2019/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉVENTION DES COMPORTEMENTS ASSOCIAUX D'ANIMAUX | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2019 | Translation filed | 28.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 29.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/25] | 22.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10114631 (KUMMERT BERNHARD [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO9732469 (BORCHELT PETER L [US]) [A] 1-6 * , description: page 1, line 20 - page 3, line 7; page 5, line 11-page 6, line 24; figures. *; | [A]US2003106501 (AUSTIN RONALD J [US]) [A] 1-6 * , description: paragraphs [6, 15]; figures. *; | [A]US2013030242 (RUEHRING MICHAEL ROLF [US]) [A] 1-6 * , description: paragraphs [20, 34, 35, 45, 49, 54, 55]; figures. *; | [A]DE4231689 (TRAUTWEIN NADINE [DE]) [A] 1-6 * ; figures. *; | [A]US2009000570 (ASHBY PAULA L [CA]) [A] 1-6 * , description: paragraphs [6, 17-19]; figures. * | [ ] - EPODOC, Database accession no. DE - 4231689 - A |