EP3492577 - DIFFERENTIATED CELL PRODUCTION METHOD AND CULTURE BAG USED THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | For all designated states Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2023/03] |
Former [2019/23] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMAZAWA, Kozue c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 02 /
HIGUCHI, Tatsuya c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 03 /
KANEKO, Shin c/o Kyoto University 36-1 Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 04 /
YASUI, Yutaka c/o Kyoto University 36-1 Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17834568.2 | 28.07.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017JP27557 | Priority number, date | JP20160150725 | 29.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016150725 | [2019/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018021566 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3492577 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12M3/00, C12M1/00, C12N5/071, C12N5/0735, C12N5/10, C12N5/074 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
C12M23/14 (EP,US);
C12N5/0606 (US);
C08F14/26 (US);
C08F214/262 (US);
C08F214/28 (US);
C09D127/18 (US);
C12M1/00 (US);
C12M23/20 (EP);
C12M3/00 (US);
C12N5/0068 (EP);
C12N5/0636 (EP,US);
C12N5/0696 (EP,US);
C12N5/10 (US);
C12N2500/25 (EP);
C12N2501/115 (EP);
C12N2501/155 (EP);
C12N2506/45 (EP);
C12N2513/00 (EP);
C12N2533/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Title | German: | DIFFERENZIERTES ZELLHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND KULTURBEUTEL DAFÜR | [2019/23] | English: | DIFFERENTIATED CELL PRODUCTION METHOD AND CULTURE BAG USED THEREFOR | [2019/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CELLULES DIFFÉRENCIÉES ET POCHE DE CULTURE UTILISÉE À CET EFFET | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2019 | Translation filed | 06.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 02.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP1657302 (NOF CORP [JP]); | [XY]EP1679365 (JMS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]WO2016104596 (NAT UNIV CORP NARA INST [JP], et al) | International search | [XY]JPS63198972 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [XY]WO2005037984 (JMS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2012519005 ; | [Y]WO2014200030 (UNIV KYOTO [JP]); | [XY]JP2014239742 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]JP2015519890 ; | [A]JP2016520307 ; |