EP3491552 - TRIGGERING APPLICATION INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOERSCHINGER, Benjamin Brandschenkestrasse 110 8002 Zurich / CH | 02 /
ABERDEEN, Douglas A. Brandschenkestrasse 110 8002 Zurich / CH | 03 /
WEISSL, Andreas Christian Brandschenkestrasse 110 8002 Zurich / CH | 04 /
ISA, Jiri Brandschenkestrasse 110 8002 Zurich / CH | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 17834900.7 | 17.05.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017US33088 | Priority number, date | US201615221329 | 27.07.2016 Original published format: US201615221329 | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018022173 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3491552 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/31 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
G06F16/313 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/901 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2019/23] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Title | German: | AUSLÖSUNG VON ANWENDUNGSINFORMATIONEN | [2019/23] | English: | TRIGGERING APPLICATION INFORMATION | [2019/23] | French: | DÉCLENCHEMENT D'INFORMATIONS D'APPLICATION | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 30.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2015175384 (QUIXEY INC [US]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0090]; figures 2D, 2E *; | [I] - Elizabeth Liddy, "How a Search Engine Works", (20100614), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20100614022849/http://www.infotoday.com/searcher/may01/liddy.htm, (20161020), XP055312483 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO2015175384 (QUIXEY INC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0003]-[0012], [0032]-[0036], [0047], [0053]-[0057], [0060], [0064], [0067], and [0084]-[0092]; claims 10-11; and figures 1A-4. *; | [Y]US2011047161 (MYAENG SUNG HYON [KR], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0034] and figures 4-5. *; | [A]US2010293174 (BENNETT PAUL N [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0007] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2013325892 (EDWARDS CATHERINE A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0006]-[0010] and [0042]-[0060]; and figures 4-5. *; | [A]US2015317679 (KONINGSTEIN ROSS [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0013] and [0047]-[0050]; and figures 1-3. * |