EP3487482 - NEW CANNABIS TABLET FORMULATIONS AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canopy Growth Corporation 1 Hershey Drive Smith Falls, Ontario K7A 0A8 / CA | [2019/27] |
Former [2019/22] | For all designated states Ebbu Inc. 35715 US Highway 40 Units D101-103 Evergreen, CO 80439 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVY, Kurt 1537 Snap Dragon Court Superior, Colorado 80027 / US | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17835148.2 | 25.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017US43808 | Priority number, date | US201662366517P | 25.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662366517 P | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018022669 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3487482 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K9/20, A61K31/01, A61K31/352, A61K47/02, A61K47/06, A61K47/38, A61K47/10, A61K9/00 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
A61K31/352 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/14 (IL);
A61K31/01 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/38 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/0053 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/146 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/1652 (IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K9/20, A61K31/01, A61K31/352, A61K47/02, A61K47/06, A61K47/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Title | German: | NEUE CANNABIS-TABLETTENFORMULIERUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/22] | English: | NEW CANNABIS TABLET FORMULATIONS AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME | [2019/22] | French: | NOUVELLES FORMULES DE COMPRIMÉS DE CANNABIS. | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 04.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2016084075 (ONE WORLD CANNABIS LTD [IL]) [X] 1-3,6-14 * example 10; tables 3-4 * * manufacturing steps; page 42, lines 1-11 *[Y] 1-15; | [XY]US2016166498 (ANASTASSOV GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7 * examples 1-2 * [Y] 1-15 | International search | [Y]WO9116882 (LIPOSOME TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [Y] 6 * ; pages 32, lines 31-34; page 33, lines 31-33; table 7 *; | [Y]US5976574 (GORDON MARC S [US]) [Y] 1-6, 18-20 * ; column 2, lines 29-38; column 4, line 1 *; | [XY]WO02064109 (GW PHARMA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 7-9, 15-16, 21, 23 * ; page 34, lines 5-20; page 38, lines 24-26; page 43, lines 22-37; page 44, lines 1-3 and 9-10; page 65, lines 9-20 * [Y] 10-14, 17, 20, 22; | [Y]US7553500 (GIERER DANIEL S [US]) [Y] 1, 3* ; column 3, lines 8-13 *; | [Y]US2010034888 (PELLIKAAN HUBERT CLEMENS [NL], et al) [Y] 5, 17, 22 * ; paragraphs [0101], [0104] *; | [Y]EP2570121 (XIE TIAN [CN]) [Y] 4-5, 10-11, 17, 19-20, 22 * ; paragraphs [0007]-[0008], [0017]-[0018] *; | [Y]US2016015683 (MCCARTY JOHN A [US]) [Y] 1-6, 12-14, 17-20, 22 * ; paragraphs [0013], [0015], [0032], [0036], [0038]-[0040], [0043]-[0044] * | by applicant | WO2016084075 | US2016166498 |