EP3559329 - SENSOR UNIT THAT CAN BE RETROFITTED FOR CONTROLLING A DOSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/05] |
Former [2019/44] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KESSLER, Arnd Schellberg 17 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | 02 /
NITSCH, Christian Otto-Hahn-Str. 185 40591 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
ZÜCHNER, Lars Dachsweg 8 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 04 /
WAWER, Georg Goldeggasse 26/14 1040 Wien / AT | 05 /
MÜLLER, Alexander Rehwechsel 2 40789 Monheim / DE | 06 /
ARTH, Clemens Strauchergasse 13 8020 Graz / AT | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 17835456.9 | 07.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017EP81850 | Priority number, date | DE201610225854 | 21.12.2016 Original published format: DE102016225854 | [2019/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018114359 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3559329 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3559329 | Date: | 02.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/00, A47L15/42, D06F33/57, D06F34/22, // A47L15/44, D06F103/18, D06F103/20, D06F105/42, D06F105/58, D06F103/02 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
A47L15/4297 (EP,KR,US);
D06F34/22 (EP,KR,US);
A47L15/0055 (EP,KR,US);
A47L15/4445 (EP,KR);
A47L15/449 (EP,KR,US);
D06F33/57 (EP,KR,US);
D06F34/04 (KR);
A47L2401/10 (EP,KR);
A47L2401/11 (EP,KR);
A47L2401/30 (EP,KR);
A47L2501/07 (EP,KR);
D06F2103/02 (EP,US);
D06F2103/18 (EP,US);
D06F2103/20 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2105/42 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/44] | D06F39/00, A47L15/42, D06F39/02, A47L15/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHRÜSTBARE SENSOREINHEIT ZUR STEUERUNG EINER DOSIERVORRICHTUNG | [2019/44] | English: | SENSOR UNIT THAT CAN BE RETROFITTED FOR CONTROLLING A DOSING DEVICE | [2019/44] | French: | UNITÉ DE DÉTECTION POUVANT ÊTRE MONTÉE À POSTERIORI POUR LA COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 05.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2017 | AL | 02.02.2022 | CY | 02.02.2022 | CZ | 02.02.2022 | DK | 02.02.2022 | EE | 02.02.2022 | FI | 02.02.2022 | HR | 02.02.2022 | LT | 02.02.2022 | LV | 02.02.2022 | MC | 02.02.2022 | MK | 02.02.2022 | NL | 02.02.2022 | RO | 02.02.2022 | RS | 02.02.2022 | SE | 02.02.2022 | SI | 02.02.2022 | SK | 02.02.2022 | SM | 02.02.2022 | BG | 02.05.2022 | NO | 02.05.2022 | GR | 03.05.2022 | IS | 02.06.2022 | PT | 02.06.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 07.12.2017 | |
AL | 02.02.2022 | ||
CY | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MK | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 07.12.2017 | |
AL | 02.02.2022 | ||
CY | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 07.12.2017 | |
AL | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 02.02.2022 | |
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 02.02.2022 | |
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 02.02.2022 | |
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 02.02.2022 | |
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | FI | 02.02.2022 | |
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 02.02.2022 | |
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 02.02.2022 | |
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 02.02.2022 | |
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 02.02.2022 | |
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 02.02.2022 | |
NO | 02.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03100153 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-15 * Seite 1, Zeilen 1-21; Seite 6, Zeile 14 - Seite 10, Zeile 14; Seite 12, Zeilen 1-15;; figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE102010003770 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0007] - [0012] - [0030] - [0039] - [0045] - [0050] - [0053] - [0056] - [0061] , [0064]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2013061889 (BASTIGKEIT THORSTEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0011] , [0023] - [0027] - [0078] - [0093]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]CN103334265 (PANASONIC HOME APPLIANCES R & D CT HANGZHOU CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]DE102015209824 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0176] - [0182]; figure -; claim - * |