EP3320747 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR UPDATING AN UPLINK CONTENTION WINDOW SIZE IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JRD Communication Inc. 16/F, Block B, TCL Tower Gaoxin Nanyi Road Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518063 / CN | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Guang 16/F Block B TCL Tower Gaoxin Nanyi Road Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518063 / CN | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Cordina, Kevin John, et al Simmons & Simmons CityPoint One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | Application number, filing date | 17835996.4 | 27.05.2017 | [2018/20] | WO2017CN86332 | Priority number, date | GB20160013512 | 05.08.2016 Original published format: GB 201613512 | [2018/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018024022 | Date: | 08.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3320747 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04L12/413 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
H04L12/413 (EP,GB,US);
H04W74/0816 (EP,GB,US);
H04L1/187 (US);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L1/1854 (US);
H04L12/4035 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/20] | H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR AKTUALISIERUNG EINER UPLINK-KONFLIKT-FENSTERGRÖSSE IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2018/20] | English: | METHODS AND DEVICES FOR UPDATING AN UPLINK CONTENTION WINDOW SIZE IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2018/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS DE MISE À JOUR D'UNE TAILLE DE FENÊTRE DE CONTENTION DE LIAISON MONTANTE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 09.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ERICSSON [HUAWEI HISILICON], "WF on CW adjustment for UL LBT based on Cat. 4", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160530), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-165713, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160530), XP051111899 [X] 1-4 * section 2.3; pages 3, 4 * | [XI] - ERICSSON, "On UL Channel Access Procedures", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-165157, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160514), XP051089829 [X] 1 * slides 2, 3 * [I] 2-4 | International search | [A]US2014112153 (JIN SUNG GEUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]CN105338651 (YULONG COMPUTER TELECOMM TECH) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [X] - HUAWEI, HISILICON, "Contention window size adjustment for UL category 4 LBT for eLAA", 3GPP TSG RAN WGI Meeting #85, R1-164073, (20160527), XP051096611 [X] 1-23 * , page 1, line 25-page 2, line 17, page 3, lines 1-3, figure 1 * |