EP3494006 - ESTIMATION OF SOC OF A LEAD-ACID BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mahindra and Mahindra Limited Mahindra Research Valley Mahindra World City P.O. 41/1-Anjur Chengalpattu, Kanchipuram Tamil Nadu, Kanchipuram District 603004 / IN | [2019/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANDEY, Nabal Kishore Mahindra&Mahindra Limited Mahindra Research Valley Mahindra World City P.O. Anjur, Chengalpattu Kanchipuram District Tamilnadu 603004 / IN | 02 /
THIMMALAPURA, Satish Mahindra&Mahindra Limited Mahindra Research Valley Mahindra World City P.O. Anjur, Chengalpattu Kanchipuram District Tamilnadu 603004 / IN | 03 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Kannan Mahindra&Mahindra Limited Mahindra Research Valley Mahindra World City P.O. Anjur, Chengalpattu Kanchipuram District Tamilnadu 603004 / IN | 04 /
TELIKEPALLI, Kumarprasad Mahindra&Mahindra Limited Mahindra Research Valley Mahindra World City P.O. Anjur, Chengalpattu Kanchipuram District Tamilnadu 603004 / IN | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt Weiß, Arat & Partner mbB Zeppelinstraße 4 78234 Engen / DE | [2019/24] | Application number, filing date | 17836529.2 | 26.07.2017 | [2019/24] | WO2017IN50307 | Priority number, date | IN201641026864 | 05.08.2016 Original published format: IN201641026864 | [2019/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018025276 | Date: | 08.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3494006 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36, G01R31/3832, G01R31/387 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
G01R31/3833 (EP,US);
G01R31/382 (US);
G01R31/387 (EP,US);
H01M10/06 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/24] | B60L11/18, G01R31/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] | Title | German: | SCHÄTZUNG DES LADESTATUS EINER BLEISÄUREBATTERIE | [2019/24] | English: | ESTIMATION OF SOC OF A LEAD-ACID BATTERY | [2019/24] | French: | ESTIMATION D'ÉTAT DE CHARGE D'UNE BATTERIE AU PLOMB-ACIDE | [2019/24] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 13.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0560468 (GLOBE UNION INC [US]) [I] 1-15* page 8, line 46 - page 10, line 49; figures 1-2,4 *; | [I]US6356083 (YING RAMONA Y [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US6646419 (YING RAMONA Y [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 7-10 * * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 13 * * column 11, line 20 - column 12, line 25 * * column 10, lines 22-35 *; | [I]EP2001074 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] - [0129] - [0040] - [0050]; figures 1,3 *; | [I]US2015112527 (ZHANG YILU [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0009] - [0022] * | International search | [Y]US6417668 (HOWARD CHARLES E [US], et al) [Y] 1, 9 * , Fig 1-4, abstract, col 5, In 21-29, col 6, In 8-15, col 6, In 58-61, col 7, In 23-35 *; | [Y]US6646419 (YING RAMONA Y [US]) [Y] 1, 9 * , Fig 4, abstract, col 2, In 25-47, col 4, In 14-34, col 11, In 20-col 12, In 5 *; | [A]US2010138176 (YU HUILI [US]) [A] 1-16 * , Fig 1, abstract, para [0013] *; | [A]US7795874 (KIRCHEV ANGEL ZHIVKOV [FR]) [A] 1-16 * , Fig 10, abstract, col 6, In 40-55 *; | [A]US8669741 (SEO SE-WOOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * , Fig 3, abstract, col 8, In 63-col 10, In 7 *; | [A]US2014368208 (YAMADA AKIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-16 * , Fig 4, abstract, para [0040]-[0043] *; | [PY]WO2017078606 (CTEK SWEDEN AB [SE]) [PY] 1, 9 * Fig 2, abstract, pg 6, In 2 -8, pg 7, In 3-pg 9, In 24, pg 11, In 18-26 *; | [A] - CHANG, W-Y., "The State of Charge Estimating Methods for Battery: A Review", ISRN Applied Mathematics, (20130000), vol. 2013, doi:10.1155/2013/953792, pages 1 - 7, XP055460880 [A] 1-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2013/953792 |