EP3490610 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF REPLICATION DEFICIENT ADENOVIRAL VECTORS FOR VACCINE APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Wistar Institute Of Anatomy And Biology 3601 Spruce Street Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19104 / US | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERTL, Hildegund C.J. c/o THE WISTAR INSTITUTE OF ANATOMY AND BIOLOGY 3601 Spruce Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19104 / US | 02 /
ZHOU, Xiang Yang 230 Tudor Drive North Wales Pennsylvania 19454 / US | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17837398.1 | 21.07.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017US43315 | Priority number, date | US201662369288P | 01.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662369288 P | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018026547 | Date: | 08.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3490610 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/50 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K48/0058 (US);
A61K39/39 (US);
A61K48/0008 (US);
A61K48/0091 (US);
A61P31/18 (EP,US);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
A61K2039/525 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Extension states | BA | 21.02.2019 | ME | 21.02.2019 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR REPLIKATIONSDEFIZIENTE ADENOVIRALE VEKTOREN FÜR IMPFSTOFFANWENDUNGEN | [2019/23] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF REPLICATION DEFICIENT ADENOVIRAL VECTORS FOR VACCINE APPLICATIONS | [2019/23] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE VECTEURS ADÉNOVIRAUX À RÉPLICATION DÉFICIENTE POUR DES APPLICATIONS DE VACCIN | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 23.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2021 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 19.05.2021 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 26.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2014248305 (ERTL HILDEGUND C J [US], et al) [X] 1,6,9-15 * para. 4, 5, 6, 9, 13, 16, 21-23; claims 1, 8-11 * [Y] 2-5,7,8; | [Y] - LASARO MARCIO O ET AL, "New insights on adenovirus as vaccine vectors", MOLECULAR THERAPY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, vol. 17, no. 8, doi:10.1038/MT.2009.130, ISSN 1525-0024, (20090801), pages 1333 - 1339, (20090609), XP002670596 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/MT.2009.130 | [Y] - NIA TATSIS ET AL, "Adenovirus Vector-Induced Immune Responses in Nonhuman Primates: Responses to Prime Boost Regimens", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, US, (20090504), vol. 182, no. 10, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.0900317, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 6587 - 6599, XP055679793 [Y] 1-15 * Materials and Methods - Adenovirus vectors; Tab. I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.0900317 | International search | [A]US2013315871 (ROY SOUMITRA [NL], et al) [A] 4-6* para [0011]; [0162]; SEQ ID NO: 246. *; | [XA]US2014065105 (WILSON JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * para [0011]; [0021]; [0025]; [0069]-[0071]; [0078]; [0111]; [0119]-[0121]; [0145]; SEQ ID NO: 5. * [A] 4-6 |