EP3493666 - CONTROL OF COLEOPTERAN PESTS USING RNA MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Crop Protection AG Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | [2024/36] |
Former [2019/44] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2019/24] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONOHUE, Kevin V. P.O. Box 12257 9 Davis Drive Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709-2257 / US | 02 /
NAUDET, Yann Ghent Innovation Center Technologiepark Zwijnaarde 30 9052 Ghent / BE | 03 /
FELDMANN, Pascale Ghent Innovation Center Technologiepark Zwijnaarde 30 9052 Ghent / BE | 04 /
DEGRAVE, Lies Ghent Innovation Center Technologiepark Zwijnaarde 30 9052 Ghent / BE | 05 /
MAILLET, Isabelle Ghent Innovation Center Technologiepark Zwijnaarde 30 9052 Ghent / BE | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/24] | Syngenta International AG B4-08.152 Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 17837511.9 | 01.08.2017 | [2019/24] | WO2017US44832 | Priority number, date | US201662371262P | 05.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662371262 P | [2019/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018026774 | Date: | 08.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3493666 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C12N15/87, C12N15/113, C12N15/12, C12N15/32, A61K31/713, A01C1/06, A01P7/04 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
C12N15/8218 (EP,US);
A01N63/60 (EP,US);
C12N15/8286 (EP,US);
Y02A40/146 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N63/60, A01N63/50 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/24] | A01H5/00, C12N15/82 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] | Title | German: | BEKÄMPFUNG VON COLEOPTEREN-SCHÄDLINGEN MITHILFE VON RNA-MOLEKÜLEN | [2019/24] | English: | CONTROL OF COLEOPTERAN PESTS USING RNA MOLECULES | [2019/24] | French: | LUTTE CONTRE DES COLÉOPTÈRES NUISIBLES AU MOYEN DE MOLÉCULES D'ARN | [2019/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 29.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0134815 (CAMBRIA BIOSCIENCES LLC [US]) [I] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X] - Lincoln Fishilevich ET AL, "University of Nebraska - RNAi as a management tool for the western corn rootworm, Diabrotica virgifera virgifera", (20160101), URL: https://digitalcommons.unl.edu/cgi/viewcontent.cgi?article=1532&context=entomologyfacpub, (20191203), XP055648663 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * | [I] - Thais Barros Rodrigues ET AL, "Management of Insect Pest by RNAi - A New Tool for Crop Protection", RNA Interference, InTech, (20160406), doi:10.5772/61807, ISBN 978-953-51-2272-2, XP055648658 [I] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5772/61807 | International search | [Y]WO2016060911 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US]) [Y] 1-8, 8/1-7, 48-49, 70 * ; abstract; paragraph [00248]; claims 1, 6 *; | [XY]WO2016105696 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [X] 69 * ; paragraphs [0019], [0194]; claims 1, 8-9, 37, 41-42, 62 * [Y] 1-8, 8/1-7, 48-49; | [Y]US9388409 (BOUKHAROV ANDREY A [US], et al) [Y] 70* ; abstract; column 6, lines 13-36; column 13, lines 48-51; column 28, lines 51-54; column 30, lines 15-25; column 43, lines 8-18; claim 4 * | by applicant | US5304730 | WO9516783 | US5451513 | US5495071 | US5545817 | US5545818 | US5569823 | US5767378 | US5849320 | US5876739 | WO9925821 | WO9925854 | WO9925840 | WO9925855 | WO9925853 | US5994629 | US6329504 | US6337431 | US2005120415 | US2005144669 | WO2006046148 | US2007124836 | US7612194 | US9012722 | US2015322456 | - J. Econ. Entomol., (20050000), vol. 98, pages 534 - 551 | - JONES-RHOADES et al., Annu. Rev. Plant Biol., (20060000), vol. 57, pages 19 - 53 | - LLAVE et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20020000), vol. 97, pages 13401 - 13406 | - WHYARD et al., Insect Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, (20090000), vol. 39, pages 824 - 832 | - SMITHWATERMAN, Advances in Applied Mathematics, (19810000), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 | - NEEDLEMANWUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - SMITHWATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, page 482 | - PEARSONLIPMAN, Proc. Nat'l. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - HENIKOFFHENIKOFF, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 89, page 10915 | - ALTSCHUL, Proc. Nat'l. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5787 | - THOMPSON et al., Nuc. Acids Res., (19940000), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 4680 | - MEINKOTHWAHL, Anal. Biochem., (19840000), vol. 138, pages 267 - 284 | - BOLOGNESI et al., PLOS One,, (20120000), vol. 7, no. 10, page e47534 | - MAO et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20070000), vol. 35, no. 11, pages 1307 - 1313 | - BARTEL, Cell, (20040000), vol. 116, pages 281 - 297 | - ZHANG et al., Dev. Biol., (20060000), vol. 289, pages 3 - 16 | - REINHART et al., Genes Dev, (20020000), vol. 16, pages 1616 - 1626 | - PARK et al., Curr. Biol., (20020000), vol. 12, pages 1484 - 1495 | - FLOYD et al., Nature, (20040000), vol. 428, pages 485 - 486 | - ZHANG et al., Plant J, (20060000), vol. 46, pages 243 - 259 | - ZHU, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (20080000), vol. 105, pages 9851 - 9852 | - MURCHISON et al., Curr. Opin. Cell Biol., (20040000), vol. 16, pages 223 - 229 | - DUGAS et al., Curr. Opin. Plant Biol., (20040000), vol. 7, pages 512 - 520 | - KIM, Nature Rev. Mol. Cell Biol., (20050000), vol. 6, pages 376 - 385 | - GENGDING, "Double-mismatched siRNAs enhance selective gene silencing of a mutant ALS-causing Allelel", Acta Pharmacol. Sin., (20080000), vol. 29, doi:10.1111/j.1745-7254.2008.00740.x, pages 211 - 216, XP055074183 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1745-7254.2008.00740.x | - SCHWARZ et al., "Asymmetry in the assembly of the RNAi enzyme complex", Cell, (20030000), vol. 115, doi:10.1016/S0092-8674(03)00759-1, pages 199 - 208, XP002521543 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(03)00759-1 | - SCHWAB et al., The Plant Cell, (20060000), vol. 18, pages 1121 - 1133 | - POTRYKUS et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19850000), vol. 199, pages 183 - 188 | - HINCHEE et al., Biotech, (19880000), vol. 6, pages 915 - 922 | - STALKER et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 242, pages 419 - 423 | - THILLET et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19880000), vol. 263, pages 12500 - 12508 | - SCHOCHER et al., Biotechnology, (19860000), vol. 4, pages 1093 - 1096 | - MCBRIDE et al., Proc. Nati. Acad. Sci. USA, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 7301 - 7305 | - SVAB, Z.HAJDUKIEWICZ, P.MALIGA, P., Proc. Nati. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 8526 - 8530 | - STAUB, J. M.MALIGA, P., Plant Cell, (19920000), vol. 4, pages 39 - 45 | - STAUB, J.M.MALIGA, P., EMBO J., (19930000), vol. 12, pages 601 - 606 | - SVAB, Z.MALIGA, P., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 913 - 917 | - GOLDSCHMIDTCLERMONT, M., Nucl. Acids Res., (19910000), vol. 19, pages 4083 - 4089 | - CHEVREUX et al., Genome Res, (20040000), vol. 14, pages 1147 - 1159 | - BOUTROS et al., Science, (20040000), vol. 303, pages 832 - 835 | - MARRONE et al., J. Econ. Entomol., (19850000), vol. 78, pages 290 - 293 | - NEGROTTO et al., Plant Cell Reports, (20000000), vol. 19, pages 798 - 803 |