EP3493748 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR LUNG VOLUME REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Change: Validation states | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | 11.10.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | 11.10.2019 | Change - extension states | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shifamed Holdings, LLC 590 Division Street Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [2019/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAER, Alan 590 Division Street Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 02 /
SAUL, Tom 590 Division Street Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 03 /
SALAHIEH, Amr 590 Division Street Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 04 /
LAU, Lilip 590 Division Street Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 05 /
TANAKA, Don 590 Division Street Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 06 /
GANDIONCO, Sid 590 Division Street Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 07 /
HA, Hung 590 Division Street Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 08 /
DATTA, Arindam 590 Division Street Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/24] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17837770.1 | 04.08.2017 | [2019/24] | WO2017US45530 | Priority number, date | US201662371171P | 04.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662371171 P | US201662376874P | 18.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662376874 P | US201662384189P | 06.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662384189 P | [2019/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018027145 | Date: | 08.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3493748 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61F2/04 (US);
A61B6/12 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (US);
A61B1/2676 (US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00026 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00411 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00809 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00876 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00951 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00986 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0409 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0411 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0417 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0427 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0429 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0446 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0464 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0496 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06171 (EP,US);
A61B5/0538 (EP,US);
A61F2002/043 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR LUNGENVOLUMENREDUKTION | [2019/24] | English: | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR LUNG VOLUME REDUCTION | [2019/24] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉDUCTION DU VOLUME PULMONAIRE | [2019/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 03.10.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002165618 (INGENITO EDWARD P [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * Entire document, especially Abstract, para[0030], Claim 1, FIG. 4A. *; | [A]US2004078054 (BIGGS MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * Entire document, especially Abstract, para[0001]-[0003], [0016], [0065]-[0070], [0100] and FIGS. 4-7. *; | [A]US2009024144 (ZEINER MARK S [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * Entire document, especially Abstract, para[0051], [0074]-[0077], [0094] and FIGS. 17, 20, 23. *; | [A]US8177769 (PERKINS RODNEY C [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * Entire document. *; | [A]US8728093 (ROUSSEAU ALEXANDRA [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * Entire document. *; | [A]WO2015006729 (SHIFAMED HOLDINGS LLC [US]) [A] 1-13 * Entire document. *; | [A]US2015342610 (RADHAKRISHNAN SRI [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * Entire document, especially Abstract, para[0062]-[0065], [0078] and FIGS. 2-5. *; | [A]WO2016115193 (SHIFAMED HOLDINGS LLC [US]) [A] 1-13* Entire document. * |