EP3498149 - OPTOELECTRONIC BINOCULAR INSTRUMENT FOR THE CORRECTION OF PRESBYOPIA AND METHOD FOR THE BINOCULAR CORRECTION OF PRESBYOPIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidad De Murcia Avda. Teniente Flomesta s/n Edificio Covalencia 30003 Murcia / ES | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARTAL SORIANO, Pablo Avda. Teniente Flomesta s/n 30003 Murcia / ES | 02 /
MOMPEAN ESTEBAN, Juan Avda. Teniente Flomesta s/n 30003 Murcia / ES | 03 /
ARAGÓN, Juan Luis Avda. Teniente Flomesta s/n 30003 Murcia / ES | [2023/29] |
Former [2019/25] | 01 /
ARTAL SORIANO, Pablo Avda. Teniente Flomesta s/n 30003 Murcia / ES | ||
02 /
MOMPEAN ESTEBA, Juan Avda. Teniente Flomesta s/n 30003 Murcia / ES | |||
03 /
ARAGÓN, Juan Luis Avda. Teniente Flomesta s/n 30003 Murcia / ES | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [2023/31] |
Former [2019/25] | Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21, 2nd floor 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 17838858.3 | 16.06.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017ES70441 | Priority number, date | ES20160031094 | 12.08.2016 Original published format: ES 201631094 | [2019/25] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018029389 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | ES | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3498149 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3498149 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 15.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/11, G02C7/08, A61B3/103, A61B3/13 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
A61B3/111 (EP,US);
A61B3/0008 (US);
A61B3/103 (EP);
A61B3/11 (US);
A61B3/112 (EP,US);
A61B3/132 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | A61B3/11, G02C7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTOELEKTRONISCHES BINOKULARES INSTRUMENT ZUR KORREKTUR VON ALTERSWEITSICHTIGKEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR BINOKULAREN KORREKTUR VON ALTERSWEITSICHTIGKEIT | [2019/25] | English: | OPTOELECTRONIC BINOCULAR INSTRUMENT FOR THE CORRECTION OF PRESBYOPIA AND METHOD FOR THE BINOCULAR CORRECTION OF PRESBYOPIA | [2019/25] | French: | INSTRUMENT BINOCULAIRE OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE POUR LA CORRECTION DE LA PRESBYTIE ET MÉTHODE POUR LA CORRECTION BINOCULAIRE DE LA PRESBYTIE | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2019 | Translation filed | 12.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 18.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012002163 (NEAL DANIEL R [US]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0097]; figures 1A - 2 *; | [Y]US2012194781 (AGUROK ILYA [US]) [Y] 5,6* paragraph [0055] *; | [Y] - JUAN MOMPEAN ET AL, "GPU-Accelerated High-Speed Eye Pupil Tracking System", 2015 27TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE AND HIGH PERFORMANCE COMPUTING (SBAC-PAD), (20150930), doi:10.1109/SBAC-PAD.2015.17, ISBN 978-1-4673-8011-9, pages 17 - 24, XP055700071 [Y] 1-6 * page 20 - page 23 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SBAC-PAD.2015.17 | International search | [Y]US2013278889 (LAPSTUN PAUL [AU]) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [1- 2, 6, 70]; *; | [A]EP2706396 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [57 - 60]; claims 1-5; *; | [Y] - MOMPEAN et al., "GPU-accelerated High-speed Eye Pupil Tracking System", 27th International Symposium on Computer Architecture and High Performance Computing, (20151017), ISSN 1550-6533, pages 17 - 24, XP032850108 [Y] 1-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SBAC-PAD.2015.17 | [A] - CHIRRE et al., "Binocular open-view instrument to measure aberrations and pupillary dynamics", Optics Letters, (20140815), vol. 39, no. 16, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 4773 - 4775, XP001591421 [A] 1-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.39.004773 | [A] - DONGHENG LI, "Starburst: A hybrid algorithm for video-based eye tracking combining feature-based and model-based approaches", IEEE Computer Society Conference on Computer Vision and pattern Recognition Proceedings, (20050921), ISSN 1063-6919, page 79, XP055340851 [A] 1-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2005.531 | [A] - SCHWARTZ C. et al., "Binocular adaptive optics vision analyzer with full control over the complex pupil functions", Optics Letters, (20111215), vol. 36, no. 24, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 4779 - 4781, XP001571569 [A] 1-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.36.004779 | [A] - KOPROWSKI R. et al., "Quantitative assessment of the impact of blood pulsation on images of the pupil in infrared light", Journal of the Optical Society of America, (20150801), vol. 32, no. 8, ISSN 1520-8532, pages 1446 - 1453, XP055463070 [A] 1-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/JOSAA.32.001446 | Examination | US2011249237 |