EP3497581 - TRUSTED PLATFORM AND INTEGRATED BOP APPLICATIONS FOR NETWORKING BOP COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dun and Bradstreet Corporation 103 JFK Parkway Short Hills, NJ 07078 / US | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANE, Eoin 50 Seapark, Malahide, Co. Dublin / IE | 02 /
BHATTACHARYYA, Anjana 330 E. 38th St., Apt. No. 51K New York, NY 10016 / US | 03 /
NIU, Yuan 454 Otisco Drive Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | 04 /
YUAN, Xin 46 Watchung Drive Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | 05 /
BASU, Nipa 6 Dillon Court Warren, NJ 07059 / US | [2019/30] |
Former [2019/25] | 01 /
LANE, Eoin 20 The Crescent Robswall Malahide Co. Dublin / IE | ||
02 /
BHATTACHARYYA, Anjana 227 Green Village Road Green Village NJ 07935 / US | |||
03 /
NIU, Yuan 454 Otisco Drive Westfield NJ 07090 / US | |||
04 /
YUAN, Xin 46 Watchung Drive Basking Ridge NJ 07920 / US | |||
05 /
BASU, Nipa 6 Dillon Court Warren NJ 07059 / US | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 17840144.4 | 08.08.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017US45911 | Priority number, date | US201662372135P | 08.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662372135 P | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018031551 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3497581 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, G06Q30/00, G06F17/00, G06F21/00, H04L9/00 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0637 (EP,US);
G06Q20/382 (US);
G06Q40/12 (EP,US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | G06F17/00, G06F21/00, H04L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Title | German: | GESICHERTE PLATTFORM UND INTEGRIERTE BOP-ANWENDUNGEN ZUR VERNETZUNG VON BOP-KOMPONENTEN | [2019/25] | English: | TRUSTED PLATFORM AND INTEGRATED BOP APPLICATIONS FOR NETWORKING BOP COMPONENTS | [2019/25] | French: | PLATEFORME DE CONFIANCE ET APPLICATIONS BOP INTÉGRÉES PERMETTANT LA MISE EN RÉSEAU DE COMPOSANTES BOP | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 25.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.09.2023 | 30.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Melanie Swan, "E-COMMERCE", (20150122), URL: http://w2.blockchain-tec.net/blockchain/blockchain-by-melanie-swan.pdf, (20170913), XP055406241 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [I] - Anonymous, "Blockchain - Wikipedia", (20160807), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Blockchain&oldid=733458189#Blocks, (20200203), XP055664551 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2009049514 (YAN ZHENG [FI], et al) [Y] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2011010309 (DUNAGAN DEBORAH L [US], et al) [A] 1-22* entire document *; | [A]US2011078452 (BLECKMANN DAVID MAURITS [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2015135018 (FAITHHILL VENTURES LTD [AU]) [Y] 1-22 * entire document * |