EP3559916 - VEHICLE LOCK AND METHOD FOR ACCESS-CONTROLLED LOADING AND/OR UNLOADING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kiekert AG Höseler Platz 2 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLÖMER, Thorsten Arenzhofstr. 29 50769 Köln / DE | 02 /
CHIMENTO, Maurizio Veilchenweg 13 42549 Velbert / DE | 03 /
DIRKSCHNIEDER, Jessica Am Ringelbusch 23 42113 Wuppertal / DE | 04 /
EGGERT, Marco Im Honnefeld 10A 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 05 /
SOMMER, David Andreas-Muhr-Str. 2 50829 Köln / DE | 06 /
ZIGANKI, Andreas Leyer Str.20 40822 Mettmann / DE | 07 /
WESTERWICK, Volker Derfflinger Str. 128 44866 Bochum / DE | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 17840474.5 | 01.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017DE101037 | Priority number, date | DE20161015444 | 23.12.2016 Original published format: DE102016015444 | [2019/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018113824 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3559916 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, B60R25/24 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
G07C9/00896 (EP,KR);
G07C9/00174 (EP,KR,US);
B60R25/24 (EP,KR,US);
B60R25/104 (US);
B60R25/305 (KR,US);
B60R25/34 (KR);
E05B81/56 (US);
E05B83/18 (US);
E05B85/26 (US);
E05F15/70 (US);
B60R2025/1013 (US);
B60R2325/101 (US);
B60R2325/103 (US);
B60R2325/105 (US);
B60R2325/106 (US);
B60R2325/205 (US);
B60Y2200/145 (KR);
E05Y2400/45 (US);
E05Y2400/85 (US);
E05Y2900/546 (US);
E05Y2900/548 (US);
G07C2009/00825 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSCHLOSS NEBST VERFAHREN FÜR EIN ZUGANGSKONTROLLIERTES BELADEN UND/ODER ENTLADEN | [2019/44] | English: | VEHICLE LOCK AND METHOD FOR ACCESS-CONTROLLED LOADING AND/OR UNLOADING | [2019/44] | French: | SERRURE DE VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGEMENT ET/OU DE DÉCHARGEMENT À ACCÈS CONTRÔLÉ | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 27.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 23.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |