EP3500629 - ROOM TEMPERATURE CURABLE ORGANOPOLYSILOXANE COMPOSITION FOR PROTECTING ELECTRIC/ELECTRONIC PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Toray Co., Ltd. 2-24, Higashishinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2019/35] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd. 1-5-1, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KODAMA, Harumi c/o Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd. 2-2 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | 02 /
ONISHI, Masayuki c/o Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd. 2-2 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | [2024/05] |
Former [2019/26] | 01 /
KODAMA, Harumi c/o Dow Corning Toray Co. Ltd. 2-2 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | ||
02 /
ONISHI, Masayuki c/o Dow Corning Toray Co. Ltd. 2-2 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/05] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2019/26] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17841445.4 | 10.08.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017JP29043 | Priority number, date | JP20160161185 | 19.08.2016 Original published format: JP 2016161185 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018034222 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3500629 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3500629 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/06, C08G77/14, C08K3/22, C08K5/29 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
C08G77/18 (EP,KR);
C08L83/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/08 (US);
C08G77/16 (EP,KR);
C08K3/22 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/26 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/36 (US);
C08K5/47 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/5419 (KR);
C08K13/02 (US);
C08K2003/2296 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2201/006 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2201/014 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/26, C08L83/04 (US,EP);
C08K5/47, C08L83/04 (US,EP);
C08L83/04, C08K3/22, C08K5/3725, C08K5/5419, C08K5/56 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEI RAUMTEMPERATUR HÄRTBARE ORGANOPOLYSILOXANZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM SCHUTZ VON ELEKTRISCHEN/ELEKTRONISCHEN TEILEN | [2019/26] | English: | ROOM TEMPERATURE CURABLE ORGANOPOLYSILOXANE COMPOSITION FOR PROTECTING ELECTRIC/ELECTRONIC PARTS | [2019/26] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ORGANOPOLYSILOXANE DURCISSABLE À TEMPÉRATURE AMBIANTE POUR PROTÉGER DES PIÈCES ÉLECTRIQUES/ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 22.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4485206 (INOUE YOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 3 * * column 3, lines 21-24 * * column 4, lines 8-12,33-60 * * column 5, lines 6-14 ** example 1 *; | [Y]US4818777 (BRAIG ADALBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * column 1, lines 5-7 * * column 1, line 26 - column 2, line 10 * * column 6, lines 34-47 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 15 *; | [Y]JP2006152181 (GE TOSHIBA SILICONES CO LTD) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4975479 (SATAKE YOSHIKATSU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3* , claim 1, column 16, lines 60-68 & JP 2-229857 A & EP 367469 A2 & CA 2001093 A1 *; | [Y]JPH0476056 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [Y] 1-3 * , claims 1-2, page 1, lower right column, lines 9 -18, page 2, upper left column, lines 7-13(No Family) *; | [Y]JP2006152181 (GE TOSHIBA SILICONES CO LTD) [Y] 1-3 * , claims 1,7,8, paragraphs [0008],[0018]-[0020], [0040],[0048], example 2 (No Family) *; | [Y]WO2012066998 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0056],[0057] & KR 10-2013-0040266 A & CN 103221486 A * | by applicant | JPS5980463 | US4818777 | JP2006152181 | JP2006316184 | JP2012251058 |