EP3502560 - BURNER HEAD FOR EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND COMBUSTION CHAMBER FOR EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT DEVICE, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD AND MAINTENANCE METHOD FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ebara Corporation 11-1 Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAZAKI Kazutomo c/o EBARA CORPORATION 11-1 Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | 02 /
KOMAI Tetsuo c/o EBARA CORPORATION 11-1 Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | 03 /
KASHIWAGI Seiji c/o EBARA CORPORATION 11-1 Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | 04 /
HOSOTANI Kazumasa c/o EBARA CORPORATION 11-1 Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | 05 /
EDA Takeshi c/o EBARA CORPORATION 11-1 Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Wimmer, Hubert, et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2021/43] |
Former [N/P] | Wimmer, Hubert, et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2019/26] | Wimmer, Hubert, et al WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17841553.5 | 18.08.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017JP29588 | Priority number, date | JP20160161017 | 19.08.2016 Original published format: JP 2016161017 | JP20170155275 | 10.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017155275 | [2019/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018034331 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502560 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3502560 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F23G7/06 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
F23G7/06 (EP,KR,US);
F23D14/20 (US);
F23D14/24 (EP,US);
F23D14/50 (US);
F23D14/62 (US);
F23G5/12 (US);
F23G5/442 (KR);
F23G7/065 (EP);
F23D14/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNERKOPF FÜR ABGASBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON, BRENNKAMMER FÜR ABGASBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND WARTUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/26] | English: | BURNER HEAD FOR EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND COMBUSTION CHAMBER FOR EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT DEVICE, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD AND MAINTENANCE METHOD FOR SAME | [2019/26] | French: | TÊTE DE BRÛLEUR POUR DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION POUR DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT, PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'ENTRETIEN ASSOCIÉS | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2019 | Translation filed | 19.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 14.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2017 | AL | 27.10.2021 | AT | 27.10.2021 | CY | 27.10.2021 | CZ | 27.10.2021 | DK | 27.10.2021 | EE | 27.10.2021 | ES | 27.10.2021 | FI | 27.10.2021 | HR | 27.10.2021 | IT | 27.10.2021 | LT | 27.10.2021 | LV | 27.10.2021 | MC | 27.10.2021 | MK | 27.10.2021 | MT | 27.10.2021 | NL | 27.10.2021 | PL | 27.10.2021 | RO | 27.10.2021 | RS | 27.10.2021 | SE | 27.10.2021 | SI | 27.10.2021 | SK | 27.10.2021 | SM | 27.10.2021 | BG | 27.01.2022 | NO | 27.01.2022 | GR | 28.01.2022 | IS | 27.02.2022 | PT | 28.02.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 18.08.2017 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
MK | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 18.08.2017 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 18.08.2017 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 27.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3838974 (HEMSATH K, et al) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [A]US4861262 (GITMAN GREGORY M [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [IA]EP2132485 (EDWARDS LTD [GB]) [I] 1,7,10,11,14,16,17 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0036] * [A] 2-4,8,13; | [A]EP2463579 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [A] 1,13,14,16,17 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1,7 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040] * | International search | [YA]JP2014081188 (GLOBAL STANDARD TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1, 5, 7-9, 11, 14-17 * , paragraphs [0020] to [0043]; fig. 1 to 8 & US 2014/0106282 A1 paragraphs [0032] to [0055]; fig. 1 to 8 & WO 2014/061943 A1 & KR 10-2014-0049183 A * [A] 2-4, 6, 10, 12-13, 18-19; | [YA]JP2008514388 (Centrotherm Clean Solutions GmbH & Co. KG) [Y] 1, 5, 7-9, 11, 14-17 * , paragraphs [0024] to [0030]; fig. 1 to 2 & US 2008/0095675 A1 paragraphs [0028] to [0034]; fig. 1 to 2 & WO 2006/034684 A1 & EP 1796820 A1 & DE 102004047440 A1 & KR 10-2007-0072529 A & CN 101031349 A * [A] 2-4, 6, 10, 12-13, 18-19; | [Y]JPH1054515 (WATANABE SEIICHI) [Y] 5, 7-9, 11, 14-17 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0017]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH1054534 (NIPPON OXYGEN CO LTD) [Y] 7-9, 11, 14-17 * , paragraphs [0008], [0010], [0016]; fig. 1 & US 6234787 B1 & WO 1998/006977 A1 & TW 342436 B *; | [Y]JP2005083745 (DAS DUENNSCHICHT ANLAGEN SYS) [Y] 11, 14-17 * , paragraphs [0043] to [0049], [0060] to [0062]; fig. 1 to 2 & US 2005/0064353 A1 paragraphs [0048] to [0054], [0066] to [0068]; fig. 1 to 2 & EP 1517083 A1 & DE 10342692 A1 *; | [A]JP2007263554 (EBARA CORP) [A] 1-19 * , paragraphs [0026] to [0060]; fig. 1 to 4 & US 2003/0054299 A1 paragraphs [0054] to [0101]; fig. 1 to 4 & WO 2000/032990 A1 & EP 1143197 A1 *; | [PA]JP5977419B (Ebara Corp.) [PA] 1-19 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0023]; fig. 1 to 2 & WO 2016/143193 A1 * |