EP3501527 - COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING MENTAL DISORDER, CONTAININGLACTOBACILLUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MD Healthcare Inc. (Sangam-dong, Woori Technology Bldg.) 1303, 9, World Cup buk-ro 56-gil Mapo-gu Seoul 03923 / KR | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Yoon-Keun 1707-805, 93 Hopyeong-ro Namyangju-si Gyeonggi-do 12146 / KR | 02 /
HAN, Pyung lim 119-901, 163 Deungchon-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07671 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Ju-Li 502 Dongwoo Vila 38 Yonsei-ro 2ma-gil Seodaemun-gu Seoul 03777 / KR | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2024/10] |
Former [2019/26] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17841640.0 | 09.08.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017KR08652 | Priority number, date | KR20160103680 | 16.08.2016 Original published format: KR 20160103680 | KR20170085020 | 04.07.2017 Original published format: KR 20170085020 | KR20170100459 | 08.08.2017 Original published format: KR 20170100459 | [2019/26] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018034457 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3501527 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3501527 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/747, A23L33/135, A61K9/00, A61P25/18, A61P25/22, A61P25/24 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
A23L33/135 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/747 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0073 (KR,US);
A61K9/127 (US);
A61P25/18 (EP,US);
A61P25/22 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | A61K35/747, A23L33/135, A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR PRÄVENTION ODER BEHANDLUNG VON GEISTIGEN STÖRUNGEN MIT LACTOBACILLUS | [2019/26] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING MENTAL DISORDER, CONTAININGLACTOBACILLUS | [2019/26] | French: | COMPOSITION PERMETTANT DE PRÉVENIR OU DE TRAITER UN TROUBLE MENTAL, CONTENANT UNE VÉSICULE DÉRIVÉE DE BACTÉRIES D'UNE ESPÈCELACTOBACILLUS | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2019 | Translation filed | 04.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 02.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NO | 06.06.2024 | [2024/33] | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0966969 (CALPIS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9,11 * paragraph [0018]; claims 1-2 * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11; | [XYI]WO2004098622 (ALIMENTARY HEALTH LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9,11 * claims 1, 6, 12 * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11; | [XYI]WO2005077391 (SYNBIOTICS AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10 * examples 1, 2, 15, 17, 20; claims 1-18 * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11; | [XYI]JP2008081434 (UNIV MIYAZAKI, et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9,11 * claims 1, 2 * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11; | [XYI]WO2008155998 (NAGASE & CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9,11 * claims 1, 5 * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11; | [XYI]KR20090041889 (DUDUWON CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,11 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004]; claim 1 * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11; | [XYI]WO2010060722 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9,11 * page 8, line 2 - line 25; claims 1, 5, 12 * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11; | [XYI]KR20110025603 (AEON MEDIX INC [KR]) [X] 1,2,6,8-10 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015]; claims 82, 95, 103, 104, 109, 110, 120 * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11; | [XYI]EP2332539 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,11 * claims 1, 7, 8 * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11; | [XYI]JP2011116666 (API CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,11 * claims 1, 3 * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11; | [Y]KR20110082481 (POSTECH ACAD IND FOUND [KR]) [Y] 1-11* claims 1, 15 *; | [XYI]WO2012089784 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,9,11 * page 3, line 12 - page 16, line 37 * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11; | [XYI]EP2937424 (UNIV NAT YANG MING [TW]) [X] 1-3,6-9 * paragraph [0050]; claims 1, 4 * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11; | [XYI]WO2016065419 (MEDLAB IP PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1-4,6,8-11 * claims 1, 8, 14 * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11; | [XYI]WO2016124642 (WINCLOVE HOLDING B V [NL]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,11 * claims 19, 21 * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11; | [XYI] - LIU YEN-WENN ET AL, "Psychotropic effects ofLactobacillus plantarumPS128 in early life-stressed and naïve adult mice", BRAIN RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20151124), vol. 1631, doi:10.1016/J.BRAINRES.2015.11.018, ISSN 0006-8993, pages 1 - 12, XP029396287 [X] 1-3,6-9 * the whole document * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.brainres.2015.11.018 | [XYI] - EUTAMENE H ET AL, "Synergy between Lactobacillus paracasei and its bacterial products to counteract stress-induced gut permeability and sensitivity increase in rats", THE JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR NUTRITION, US, (20070101), vol. 137, no. 8, ISSN 0022-3166, pages 1901 - 1907, XP008096506 [X] 1,2,6,8,9 * the whole document * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11 | [XYI] - LUTGENDORFF FEMKE ET AL, "The role of microbiota and probiotics in stress-induced gastrointestinal damage", CURRENT MOLECULAR MEDICINE, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (20080601), vol. 8, no. 4, ISSN 1566-5240, pages 282 - 298, XP009150148 [X] 1,2,6,8,9,11 * the whole document * [Y] 1-11 [I] 1-11 | International search | [XY]KR20110025603 (AEON MEDIX INC [KR]) [X] 1-6, 8, 17-22, 24, 26 * See paragraphs [0014], [0015], [0080], [0121] and [0128]; claims 82, 95, 103, 104, 109, 110, 120. * [Y] 7, 9-16, 23; | [Y]KR20110082481 (POSTECH ACAD IND FOUND [KR]) [Y] 7, 9-16, 23 * See claims 1, 8 and 15. *; | [A]US2007104738 (TATISCHEFF IRENE [FR], et al) [A] 1-24, 26 * See claim 18. *; | [A] - SCHERTZER, J. W. et al., "Bacterial Outer Membrane Vesicles in Trafficking, Communication and the Host-pathogen Interaction", Journal of Molecular Microbiology and Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1159/000346770, pages 118 - 130, XP009185196 [A] 1-24, 26 * See abstract; "Virulence/Predation" section. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000346770 | [A] - BROWN, L. et al., "Extracellular Vesicles Produced by the Gram-positive Bacterium Bacillus Subtilis Are Disrupted by the Lipopeptide Surfactin", Molecular Microbiology, (20140000), vol. 93, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1111/mmi.12650, pages 183 - 198, XP055466011 [A] 1-24, 26 * See abstract. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/mmi.12650 | [A] - ZABOROWSKI, M. P. et al., "Extracellular Vesicles: Composition, Biological Relevance, and Methods of Study", BioScience, (20150000), vol. 65, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1093/biosci/biv084, pages 783 - 797, XP055466019 [A] 1-24, 26 * See abstract; figure 2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/biosci/biv084 |