EP3500138 - POCKETED SPRING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L&P Property Management Company 4095 Firestone Boulevard South Gate, CA 90280 / US | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEWETT, Jason 7777 County Road 110 Carthage, MO 64836 / US | 02 /
RICHMOND, Darrell A. 8151 County Road 164 Carthage, MO 64836 / US | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17841901.6 | 11.08.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017US46412 | Priority number, date | US201662377074P | 19.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662377074 P | US201715447717 | 02.03.2017 Original published format: US201715447717 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018034951 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3500138 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3500138 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47C23/04, A47C27/00 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
A47C27/064 (EP,US);
A47C27/05 (EP,US);
A47C27/062 (EP,US);
A47C27/066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEDERANORDNUNG MIT TASCHEN | [2019/26] | English: | POCKETED SPRING ASSEMBLY | [2019/26] | French: | ENSEMBLE RESSORT À POCHES | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 11.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2020 | Observations by third parties | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2021 | Observations by third parties | 12.09.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.09.2022 | 13.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23171907.1 / EP4245190 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2024
01.08.2024
ADMISSIBLE IKEA of Sweden AB Tulpanvägen 8 34381 Älmhult / SE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2024/36] | 16.08.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | CZ | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004128773 (BARBER JAMES R [US]); | [A]US2015359349 (EIGENMANN GUIDO [US], et al); | [A]US2016166076 (MOSSBECK NIELS S [US]) | International search | [A]US6272706 (MCCUNE RICHARD L [US], et al); | [A]US6295676 (WARNER BRADLEY [CA]); | [A]US2004103479 (MOSSBECK NIELS S [US], et al); | [A]US2015359349 (EIGENMANN GUIDO [US], et al); | [A]US2016045034 (HÄGER BENGT [SE], et al); | [A]US2016166076 (MOSSBECK NIELS S [US]) | Examination | US3626523 | CA2258713 | US6272706 | US6295676 | EP1565089 | other | US3626523 | CA2258713 | EP1565089 | Opposition | US3626523 | US6295676 | US6684435 | EP1565089 | US2016166076 |