EP3504361 - AN APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING FIBRES FROM PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gondar Group Inc. 413-971 Corydon Avenue Winnipeg, Manitoba R3M 3V3 / CA | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEVENHUYSEN, Gustaaf Peter 762 Carter Avenue Winnipeg Manitoba R3M 2C9 / CA | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 17842487.5 | 23.08.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017CA50993 | Priority number, date | US201662378506P | 23.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662378506 P | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018035607 | Date: | 01.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3504361 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 01.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D01B1/10, D01B1/30, D01B1/40 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
D01B1/10 (EP,US);
D01B1/30 (US);
D01B1/42 (US);
D10B2201/01 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG VON FASERN AUS PFLANZEN | [2019/27] | English: | AN APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING FIBRES FROM PLANTS | [2019/27] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE SÉPARER LES FIBRES DES PLANTES | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 03.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/16] | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2979781 (REIDER MALCOLM J) [A] 1,2,4,6,8,10-12,19 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 2; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2007116473 (NATURE TRUST INC [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 65] * * paragraph [0073]; figures 4-6 * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077]; figures 8, 9 * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0112]; figures 14, 15 *; | [Y]US2008020449 (MATSUBARA HIRONORI [JP], et al) [Y] 14,15 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0087]; figures 9-11 *; | [Y]US2012324677 (HAO XINMIN [CN], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0056]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0072]; figures 5-7 * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0081]; figure 8 *; | [AD]WO2015039243 (UNIV MANITOBA [CA]) [AD] 1,19 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] ** paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0096] *; | [X]CN205347632U (UNIV HAINAN) [X] 1,4,6-8,10,11,19 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 32] , [0 36] * * figures 1, 2, 5, 7 * | International search | [X]US2012324677 (HAO XINMIN [CN], et al) [X] 1-20 *whole document*; | [A]WO2015039243 (UNIV MANITOBA [CA]) [A] 0*cited by applicant* *whole document*; | [X]CN205347632U (UNIV HAINAN) [X] 1-20 *whole document* |