EP3505505 - METHOD FOR CONVERTING BUTENES, AND METHOD FOR PURIFYING MONOFLUOROBUTANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeon Corporation 6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIMOTO Tatsuya c/o ZEON CORPORATION 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 17843481.7 | 17.08.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017JP29562 | Priority number, date | JP20160165126 | 25.08.2016 Original published format: JP 2016165126 | [2019/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018037999 | Date: | 01.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3505505 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/395, C07C17/26, C07C19/08, C07C23/04 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
C07C17/26 (EP,US);
C07C17/395 (EP,KR,US);
C07C17/392 (US);
C07C17/383 (EP);
C07C19/08 (KR,US);
C07C23/04 (KR,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/26, C07C23/04 (EP);
C07C17/383, C07C19/08 (EP);
C07C17/395, C07C19/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON BUTENEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFREINIGUNG VON MONOFLUORBUTAN | [2019/27] | English: | METHOD FOR CONVERTING BUTENES, AND METHOD FOR PURIFYING MONOFLUOROBUTANE | [2019/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION DE BUTÈNES ET PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DE MONOFLUOROBUTANE | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2019 | Translation filed | 05.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 09.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS5062951 (Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.) [Y] 1-5 * , claims; page 5, upper right column, line 12 to lower left column, line 13; page 7, upper right column, line 12 to lower left column, line 12; examples & CH 589016 A5 & DE 2324390 A1 & FR 2184793 A1 & GB 1432540 A & IL 42255 A & IT 987250 B & NL 7306662 A & US 3917667 A & US 4008287 A & US 4012430 A claims; column 2, lines 28 to 53; column 4, line 67 to column 5, line 27; examples *; | [Y]WO2015008781 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5* , claims; paragraphs [0024] to [0028]; examples & CN 105358510 A & EP 3023403 A1 & JP 2015-38054 A & KR 10-2016-0027093 A & TW 201509876 A & US 2016/0145177 A1 claims; paragraphs [0037] to [0043]; examples *; | [Y]JP2015044777 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [Y] 1-5 * , claims; paragraphs [0017] to [0018]; examples (Family: none) * | by applicant | WO20158781 | US2550953 | JPS5946251 | JPS6032718 | JP2002524431 | WO2009123038 | JP2009292749 | JP2013095669 | WO2014136877 | JP2015044777 | - Journal of the American Chemical Society, (19540000), vol. 76, page 6162 | - Journal of the American Chemical Society, (19560000), vol. 78, page 5447 | - Journal of Organic Chemistry, (19790000), vol. 44, page 3872 | - Bulletin of the Chemical Society of Japan, (19790000), vol. 52, page 3377 |