EP3505760 - LIQUID SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eagle Industry Co., Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | For all designated states Eagle Industry Co., Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Koichi c/o Eagle Industry Co. Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 17843487.4 | 18.08.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017JP29592 | Priority number, date | JP20160162907 | 23.08.2016 Original published format: JP 2016162907 | [2019/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018038005 | Date: | 01.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3505760 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/08 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
F04B43/084 (EP);
F04B43/088 (KR,US);
F04B43/08 (US);
F04B53/00 (KR);
F05B2210/11 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSZUFUHRSYSTEM | [2019/27] | English: | LIQUID SUPPLY SYSTEM | [2019/27] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN LIQUIDE | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2019 | Translation filed | 15.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 02.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [YA]JPH0229386U (Eagle Kogyo Co., Ltd.) [Y] 1, 3-4 * , specification, page 4, line 17 to page 7, line 13; fig. 1 (Family: none) *[A] 2; | [YA]WO2012124363 (EAGLE IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1, 3-4 * , paragraphs [0059] to [0066]; fig. 4 to 5 & US 2014/0054318 A1 paragraphs [0067] to [0074]; fig. 4 to 5 & EP 2687793 A1 & CN 103261817 A * [A] 2 |