EP3504541 - SIMULTANEOUS INVERSION OF NMR MULTIPLE ECHO TRAINS AND CONVENTIONAL WELL LOGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/27] | SIMULTANEOUS INVERSION OF NMR MULTIPLE ECHO TRAINS AND CONVENTIONAL LOGS | ||
[2023/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker Hughes Holdings LLC 17021 Aldine Westfield Houston, TX 77073 / US | [2023/15] |
Former [2019/27] | For all designated states Baker Hughes, a GE company, LLC 17021 Aldine Westfield Houston, TX 77073 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARRO, Julio Roberto 17021 Aldine Westfield Houston, Texas 77073 / US | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [2023/16] |
Former [2019/27] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17844173.9 | 18.08.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017US47504 | Priority number, date | US201615244216 | 23.08.2016 Original published format: US201615244216 | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018039054 | Date: | 01.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3504541 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3504541 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/32, G01V11/00 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
G01V3/32 (EP,US);
G01V3/38 (US);
G01V11/00 (EP);
Y02A90/30 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/27] | G01N24/08, G01N33/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEICHZEITIGE INVERSION VON NMR-MEHRFACHECHOFOLGEN UND KONVENTIONELLEN BOHRLOCHMESSPROTOKOLLEN | [2023/03] | English: | SIMULTANEOUS INVERSION OF NMR MULTIPLE ECHO TRAINS AND CONVENTIONAL WELL LOGS | [2023/02] | French: | INVERSION SIMULTANÉE DE TRAINS D'ÉCHOS RMN MULTIPLES ET DIAGRAPHIES DE PUITS CONVENTIONNELLES | [2023/02] |
Former [2019/27] | GLEICHZEITIGE INVERSION VON NMR-MEHRFACHECHOZÜGEN UND KONVENTIONELLEN PROTOKOLLEN | ||
Former [2019/27] | SIMULTANEOUS INVERSION OF NMR MULTIPLE ECHO TRAINS AND CONVENTIONAL LOGS | ||
Former [2019/27] | INVERSION SIMULTANÉE DE TRAINS D'ÉCHOS RMN MULTIPLES ET DIAGRAPHIES CONVENTIONNELLES | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 02.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.04.2023 | AT | 19.04.2023 | CZ | 19.04.2023 | DK | 19.04.2023 | EE | 19.04.2023 | ES | 19.04.2023 | FI | 19.04.2023 | HR | 19.04.2023 | IT | 19.04.2023 | LT | 19.04.2023 | LV | 19.04.2023 | MC | 19.04.2023 | NL | 19.04.2023 | PL | 19.04.2023 | RO | 19.04.2023 | RS | 19.04.2023 | SE | 19.04.2023 | SI | 19.04.2023 | SK | 19.04.2023 | SM | 19.04.2023 | GR | 20.07.2023 | IE | 18.08.2023 | LU | 18.08.2023 | IS | 19.08.2023 | PT | 21.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | FR | 31.08.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IE | 18.08.2023 | ||
LU | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
FR | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IE | 18.08.2023 | ||
LU | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
LU | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
LU | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
LU | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 19.04.2023 | |
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 19.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008154509 (HEATON NICHOLAS [NL]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 3] - [0005] - [00 9] , [0 17] , [0 26] , [0 50] , [0 53] , [0 57]; claims 1, 13-14 *; | [A]US2011066404 (SALAZAR-TIO RAFAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] *; | [A]CN102608664 (UNIV CHINA PETROLEUM) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0008] - [0020] *; | [A]US2014253116 (FREEDMAN ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0015] - [0 49] *; | [I]US2014320126 (HEATON NICHOLAS [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0 26] - [0032] - [0 40] , [0 63] , [0 70] , [0 72] , [0 93] , [ 117] * | International search | [A]US2006158184 (EDWARDS CARL M [US]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0025]-[0048] and figures 5A, 5B. *; | [A]US2008234937 (FANG SHENG [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-9 and figure 3. *; | [A]US2009189604 (ROMERO PEDRO ANTONIO [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0049], claims 11-13 and figure 3. *; | [A]EP1672392 (SCHLUMBERGER SERVICES PETROL [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0020] and figures 1, 2. *; | [A]US2011054795 (KLEIN JAMES D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0054] and figure 1. * | by applicant | US2008154509 | US2011066404 | US2014253116 | US2014320126 |