EP3504545 - MINIATURIZED DISCHARGE PHOTO-IONIZATION DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of The University of Michigan Office of Technology Transfer 1600 Huron Parkway, 2nd Floor Ann Arbor, MI 48109-2590 / US | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAN, Xudong 9011 Emerson Dr. Saline Michigan 48176 / US | 02 /
ZHU, Hongbo 2500 Pittsfield Blvd. Ann Arbor Michigan 48014 / US | 03 /
KURABAYASHI, Katsuo 4464 Lake Forest Dr. W Ann Arbor Michigan 48108 / US | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 17844419.6 | 24.08.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017US48422 | Priority number, date | US201662378770P | 24.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662378770 P | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018039457 | Date: | 01.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3504545 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3504545 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/64, G01N27/64, G01N30/02 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
G01N27/64 (EP,US);
G01N27/66 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/27] | G01N30/64, G01N27/70, G01N30/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MINIATURISIERTER ENTLADUNGSPHOTOIONISATIONSDETEKTOR | [2019/27] | English: | MINIATURIZED DISCHARGE PHOTO-IONIZATION DETECTOR | [2019/27] | French: | DÉTECTEUR À PHOTOIONISATION DE DÉCHARGE DE TYPE MINIATURISÉ | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 10.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.08.2017 | AL | 18.08.2021 | AT | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | DK | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | FI | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | MK | 18.08.2021 | NL | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | RS | 18.08.2021 | SE | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | TR | 18.08.2021 | IE | 24.08.2021 | LU | 24.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | NO | 18.11.2021 | GR | 19.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 24.08.2017 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
MK | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 24.08.2021 | ||
LU | 24.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 24.08.2017 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 24.08.2021 | ||
LU | 24.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 24.08.2021 | ||
LU | 24.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 24.08.2021 | ||
LU | 24.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 24.08.2021 | ||
LU | 24.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 24.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 24.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 24.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 24.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5855850 (SITTLER FRED C [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015130473 (AGAH MASOUD [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A] - HONGBO ZHU ET AL, "Flow-through microfluidic photoionization detectors for rapid and highly sensitive vapor detection", LAB ON A CHIP, (20150721), vol. 15, no. 14, doi:10.1039/C5LC00328H, ISSN 1473-0197, pages 3021 - 3029, XP055467923 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5LC00328H | [A] - ZHU ET AL., "Supplementary Information to Flow-through microfluidic photoionization detectors for rapid and highly sensitive vapor detection", LAB ON A CHIP, (20150630), pages 1 - 13, XP055467927 [A] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c5lc00328h | [A] - M. AKBAR ET AL, "GC-on-chip: integrated column and photoionization detector", LAB ON A CHIP, (20150407), vol. 15, no. 7, doi:10.1039/C4LC01461H, ISSN 1473-0197, pages 1748 - 1758, XP055467929 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C4LC01461H | [A] - MUHAMMAD AKBAR ET AL, "Chip-scale gas chromatography: From injection through detection", MICROSYSTEMS & NANOENGINEERING, (20151201), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1038/micronano.2015.39, pages 1 - 8, XP055467932 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/micronano.2015.39 | [XP] - HONGBO ZHU ET AL, "Low-Power Miniaturized Helium Dielectric Barrier Discharge Photoionization Detectors for Highly Sensitive Vapor Detection", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20160825), vol. 88, no. 17, doi:10.1021/acs.analchem.6b02180, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 8780 - 8786, XP055467934 [XP] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.analchem.6b02180 | International search | [A]US5855850 (SITTLER FRED C [US]) [A] 1-21 * See claim 1; figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2012136268 (LI BO [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * See claims 1, 15 and 23; figures 1-2. *; | [A] - ZHU, HONGBO et al., "Flow-through microfluidic photoionization detectors for rapid and highly sensitive vapor detection", Lab on a Chip, (20150000), vol. 15, pages 3021 - 3029, XP055467923 [A] 1-21 * , Supplementary Information (pp. 1-13) See abstract; page 3022 left column 2nd paragraph; figure 1; table SI. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5LC00328H | [ ] - Zhu et al., "Supplementary Information to Flow-through microfluidic photoionization detectors for rapid and highly sensitive vapor detection", Lab on a Chip, (20150630), pages 1 - 13, XP055467927 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c5lc00328h | [A] - AKBAR, MUHAMMAD et al., "GC-on-chip: integrated column and photoionization detector", Lab on a Chip, (20150000), vol. 15, pages 1748 - 1758, XP055467929 [A] 1-21 * See abstract; page 1749, Chip operation section; figure 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C4LC01461H | [A] - AKBAR, MUHAMMAD et al., "Chip-scale gas chromatography: From injection through detection", Microsystems & Nanoengineering, (20151221), vol. 1, pages 1 - 8, XP055467932 [A] 1-21 * See the whole document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/micronano.2015.39 | [PX] - ZHU, HONGBO et al., "Low-power miniaturized helium dielectric barrier discharge photoionization detectors for highly sensitive vapor detection", Analytical Chemistry, (20160825), vol. 88, pages 8780 - 8786, XP055467934 [PX] 1-21 * , Supplementary Information (S-1-15) See abstract; page 8781, left column, 3rd paragraph-page 8782, left column, 1st paragraph; figures 1, SI and S3; table SI. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.analchem.6b02180 |