EP3503886 - COMBINATION THERAPY WITH GLUTAMINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calithera Biosciences, Inc. 343 Oyster Point Boulevard Suite 200 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARLATI, Francesco 1035 York Street San Francisco, California 94110 / US | 02 /
ORFORD, Keith 3819 Charter Club Drive Doylestown, Pennsylvania 18902 / US | 03 /
WHITING, Sam H. 8920 Sand Point Way NE Seattle, Washington 98115 / US | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17844477.4 | 25.08.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017US48581 | Priority number, date | US201662379604P | 25.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662379604 P | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018039544 | Date: | 01.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3503886 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 01.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/433, A61K31/501, A61P35/00, C07D417/02, C07D417/14, A61K31/4439, A61K31/4545, A61K31/47, A61K31/5377, A61K45/06 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/501 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/47 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2300/00 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4545, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/47, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/501, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2019/27] | A61K31/433, A61K31/501, A61P35/00, C07D417/02, C07D417/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE MIT GLUTAMINASEINHIBITOREN | [2019/27] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPY WITH GLUTAMINASE INHIBITORS | [2019/27] | French: | POLYTHÉRAPIE COMPRENANT DES INHIBITEURS DE GLUTAMINASE | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 17.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 14.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014142081 (LEMIEUX RENE M [US], et al) [A] 1-11,14,15 * claims 1,10-19 * * paragraph [0143] *; | [X]WO2016077632 (BUCK INST FOR RES ON AGING [US]) [X] 1-11,14,15 * claims 1,2,42,46,54,55 ** paragraphs [0005] , [0006] * | International search | [Y]WO2014078645 (CALITHERA BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-73, 76-81 * Pages 106-107, examples 7 and 9, and figures 5 and 7 *; | [Y]WO2015192014 (CALITHERA BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [Y] 1-73, 76-81 * Examples 2-3 (pages 65-66) *; | [A]WO2016004418 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [A] 1-81* Whole document *; | [XY] - Anonymous, "Study of the Glutaminase Inhibitor CB-839 in Solid Tumors", (20160822), pages 1 - 9, National Library of Medicine, URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/show/NCT02071862, XP055468661 [X] 1-8, 11-73, 78-81 * The whole document * [Y] 1-73, 76-81 | [Y] - XIANG, YAN et al., "Targeted inhibition of tumor-specific glutaminase diminishes cell - autonomous tumorigenesis", The Journal of clinical investigation, (20150425), vol. 125, no. 6, pages 2293 - 2306, XP055217500 [Y] 1-73, 76-81 * Discussion section, page 2302 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI75836 | [Y] - SCHILLER, JOAN H. et al., "Efficacy and safety of axitinib in patients with advanced non-small- cell lung cancer: results from a phase II study", Journal of Clinical Oncology, (20090810), vol. 27, no. 23, pages 3836 - 3841, XP055470264 [Y] 1-7, 10-70, 76-81 * Page 3840, two last paragraph of the discussion section * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2008.20.8355 | [Y] - TANIZAKI, JUNKO et al., "MET tyrosine kinase inhibitor crizotinib (PF-02341066) shows differential antitumor effects in non-small cell lung cancer according to MET alterations", Journal of Thoracic Oncology, (20151120), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 1624 - 1631, XP055470266 [Y] 1-7, 9, 11-70, 78-81 * Whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/JTO.0b013e31822591e9 |