EP3508879 - DETECTION DEVICE AND DETECTION METHOD OF ULTRASONIC BLIND AREA OF VEHICLE FOR PREVENTING GROUND MISMEASUREMENT AND MISINFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chen, Wuqiang F4 No.190 Simingyuan Tongan Industrial Concentration Area Xiamen, Fujian 361100 / CN | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Franz-Mayer-Str. 16a 93053 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/28] | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 17845156.3 | 07.08.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017CN96210 | Priority number, date | CN201610759685 | 30.08.2016 Original published format: CN201610759685 | [2019/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018040854 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3508879 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S15/93, G01S15/87, G01S15/08, B60R16/023 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
B60R16/023 (EP);
B60R16/0232 (CN,US);
G01S15/931 (CN,US);
G01S15/08 (EP,CN,US);
G01S15/93 (EP);
B60W2420/54 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/28] | G01S15/93, G01S15/08, B60R16/023 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Title | German: | DETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND DETEKTIONSVERFAHREN FÜR ULTRASCHALL-TOTWINKELBEREICH EINES FAHRZEUGS ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON BODENFALSCHMESSUNG UND FALSCHINFORMATIONEN | [2019/28] | English: | DETECTION DEVICE AND DETECTION METHOD OF ULTRASONIC BLIND AREA OF VEHICLE FOR PREVENTING GROUND MISMEASUREMENT AND MISINFORMATION | [2019/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UNE ZONE AVEUGLE ULTRASONORE D'UN VÉHICULE POUR EMPÊCHER UNE MAUVAISE MESURE DU SOL ET DES INFORMATIONS ERRONÉES | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2019 | Translation filed | 01.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 18.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 25.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102013200793 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0009] - [0012] - [0021] , [0026] * [I] 4-6; | [XI]US2014247161 (HALLEK MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-10 * paragraphs [0017] , [0044] - [0045] - [0053] , [0058]; figures 2-3 *[I] 4-6; | [XI]CN104442812 (CHEN WUQIANG) [X] 1-3,7-10 * abstract * [I] 4-6 | International search | [A]CN2257926Y (TANG BIRONG [CN]) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [A]CN103913748 (UNIV WUHAN TECH) [A] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0017]-[0022], and figure 1 *; | [A]DE102014115000 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10* , entire document *; | [A]CN105717510 (CHEN WUQIANG) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [XP]CN106314327 (CHEN WUQIANG) [XP] 1-10 * , claims 1-10 * |