EP3508786 - OPTICAL-THERMAL SYSTEM BASED ON TWO-DIMENSIONAL THERMAL PLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eidopia, S.L. C/ Monasterio de las Batuecas 13-D - 4º2 28049 Madrid / ES | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCÍA RODRÍGUEZ, Lucas c/ Monasterio de las Batuecas 13-D - 4º2 28049 Madrid / ES | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 17845586.1 | 01.09.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017ES70595 | Priority number, date | ES20160031151 | 02.09.2016 Original published format: ES 201631151 | [2019/28] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018042070 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | ES | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3508786 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 08.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F21V29/00 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
F21K9/233 (EP);
F21V29/763 (EP,US);
F21V29/51 (EP);
F21V29/773 (EP);
F21V29/80 (EP);
F21V29/83 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Title | German: | OPTISCH-THERMISCHES SYSTEM BASIEREND AUF ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN THERMISCHEN PLATTEN | [2019/28] | English: | OPTICAL-THERMAL SYSTEM BASED ON TWO-DIMENSIONAL THERMAL PLATES | [2019/28] | French: | SYSTÈME OPTO-THERMIQUE COMPRENANT DES PLAQUES THERMIQUES BIDIMENSIONNELLES | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2019 | Translation filed | 22.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 20.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/36] | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/36] | Public notification(s) | Communication pursuant to Rule 70(2)&70a(2) (EPO Form 1224 dated 21/07/2020) | Eidopia, S.L. C/ Monasterio de las Batuecas 13-D - 4º2 28049 Madrid / ES | [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006033998 (MAGNA INT INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-6,9-11,13-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0024] * * figures 1-6 *; | [Y]EP1681527 (CPUMATE INC [TW]) [Y] 1-6,9-11,13-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0018] * * figures 1-7 *; | [I]FR3007122 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [I] 1-6 * page 6, line 12 - page 19, line 7 * * figures 1-20 *; | [I]US2015219329 (KIM HYUN JIK [KR]) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1-6 * | International search | [XYA]US2012195042 (CHU TIN PO [CN], et al) [X] 1-3, 11, 12, 14, 17, 18-20 * , Figures; Paragraphs [0056]-[0072] * [Y] 8, 9, 10, 13, 15, 16 [A] 4-7; | [XYA]JP2004127716 (NICHIA KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1, 2, 3, 11 * , Figures * [Y] 9, 10 [A] 4-7; | [XA]US2010264797 (WANG BILY [TW], et al) [X] 1, 2, 3, 8 * , Figures; paragraphs [0023]-[0033] * [A] 4-7; | [XYA]US2008192477 (HOLDER RONALD G [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 3 * , Paragraphs [0036]-[0037]; figures 1 and 2 * [Y] 8 [A] 4-7; | [XY]US2010103678 (VAN DE VEN ANTONY PAUL [CN], et al) [X] 1, 2, 3 * , figure 7a, paragraph [0240] * [Y] 13; | [Y]US2013170217 (LEE WEN-SUNG [TW]) [Y] 15, 16 * , Figures 1-4 * |