EP3508777 - VEHICULAR LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 8-3 Takanawa 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8711 / JP | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAI, Hiroki c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | 02 /
TAKADA, Kenichi c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | 03 /
SAKURAI, Kazutoshi c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | 04 /
NOZUE, Shuhei c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | 05 /
HANADA, Akira c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | 06 /
MATSUMOTO, Akinori c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | 07 /
KAGIYAMA, Shinji c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | 08 /
HONDA, Takahiko c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | [2023/07] |
Former [2019/28] | 01 /
KAWAI Hiroki c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKADA Kenichi c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKURAI Kazutoshi c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | |||
04 /
NOZUE Shuhei c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | |||
05 /
HANADA Akira c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | |||
06 /
MATSUMOTO Akinori c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | |||
07 /
KAGIYAMA Shinji c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | |||
08 /
HONDA Takahiko c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 17846667.8 | 31.08.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017JP31425 | Priority number, date | JP20160172134 | 02.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016172134 | [2019/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018043663 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3508777 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F21V5/00, F21V5/02, F21V5/04, F21Y115/10, F21S41/24, F21S41/143, F21S41/151, F21S41/255, F21S41/20, F21S41/43, F21S41/663 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
F21S41/43 (EP,KR,US);
F21S41/143 (EP,KR,US);
F21V5/04 (US);
F21S41/151 (EP,KR,US);
F21S41/24 (EP);
F21S41/255 (EP,KR,US);
F21S41/285 (EP,KR,US);
F21S41/663 (EP,KR,US);
F21V5/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/28] | F21S41/00, F21V5/00, F21V5/02, F21V5/04, F21Y115/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGLAMPE | [2019/28] | English: | VEHICULAR LAMP | [2019/28] | French: | LAMPE DE VÉHICULE | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2019 | Translation filed | 01.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 17.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2860280 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * page 18, line 29 - page 23, line 34 * * figure 9 *; | [X]DE102007052696 (ZIZALA LICHTSYSTEME GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0078] * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE102010021937 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023] ** figure 1 *; | [X]DE102010046021 (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraph [0074] * * figures 6,7,8 * | International search | [A]JP2003317514 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-5* , fig. 13 & US 2003/0214815 A1 fig. 13 & EP 1357333 A2 & CN 1456837 A *; | [XA]US2010226142 (BRENDLE MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [X] 1, 3-5 * , paragraphs [0037] to [0057]; fig. 3 to 4, 6 to 12 & DE 102009008631 A1 & FR 2942020 A1 * [A] 2; | [XA]JP2014060102 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0030]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) * [A] 3-5; | [A]WO2016006138 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0257] to [0295]; fig. 1, 14 & US 2017/0198877 A1 paragraphs [0282] to [0320]; fig. 1, 14 *; | [A]JP2016039110 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2016/0040848 A1 entire text; all drawings & DE 102015215200 A1 & FR 3024762 A1 * | by applicant | JP2006164735 | JP20160172134 |