EP3504525 - METHOD FOR ESTIMATING ILLUMINANCE AND AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Jeong-Ho 1324-803 54 Dongtansunhwan-daero 21-gil Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18482 / KR | 02 /
YOON, Hee-Woong 5-1102 205 Nonhyeon-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06270 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Il-Young 102-103 18 Bongyeong-ro 1482beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16695 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Jeongyeol 107-1204 36 Gwongwang-ro 260beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16532 / KR | 05 /
RHO, Hyungjin 1103-503 41 Heungdeokjungang-ro 105beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16951 / KR | 06 /
JUNG, Song Hee 111-602 25-33 Deogyeong-daero 1323beon-gil Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16554 / KR | 07 /
KWON, Oheon 1003-905 24 Heungdeokjungang-ro 105beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16951 / KR | 08 /
CHOI, Heejun 53-5 Joyang-ro Hongseong-eup Hongseong-gun Chungcheongnam-do 32227 / KR | 09 /
PARK, Jeong-Min 907-3001 276 Dongtandaerosibeom-gil Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18477 / KR | 10 /
LEE, Kihuk 1006-2001 45 Gwanggyohosugongwon-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16516 / KR | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 17846833.6 | 13.07.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017KR07521 | Priority number, date | KR20160110238 | 29.08.2016 Original published format: KR 20160110238 | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018043908 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3504525 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/20, G09G3/36, G09G3/32 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
G09G3/20 (EP,US);
G01J1/4257 (KR);
H04N23/68 (US);
G01J1/4214 (KR);
H04N23/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/611 (US);
H04N23/67 (EP,US);
H04N23/6842 (US);
H04N23/71 (EP,US);
G01J2001/4266 (KR);
G09G2300/0426 (EP,US);
G09G2360/14 (EP,US);
G09G2360/144 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/27] | G01J1/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DER BELEUCHTUNGSSTÄRKE UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2019/27] | English: | METHOD FOR ESTIMATING ILLUMINANCE AND AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE THEREOF | [2019/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'ESTIMER L'ÉCLAIREMENT ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ASSOCIÉ | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 03.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2009152445 (GARDNER JR W BRYSON [US]); | [XY]US2014132158 (LAND BRIAN R [US], et al); | [XY]US2014166850 (ZHENG DONG [US]) | International search | [Y]US2003076332 (CHOI HYON-SHIK [KR]); | [Y]US2012147068 (GONDO KENJI [US]); | [YA]US2014160007 (LEE DONG-GEUN [KR]); | [A]WO2015016634 (MALSAENG CO LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2016108445 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |