EP3507302 - CONDITIONALLY ACTIVE POLYPEPTIDES AND METHODS OF GENERATING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioAtla, Inc. 11085 Torreyana Road, Suite 100 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2021/33] |
Former [2019/28] | For all designated states Bioatla, LLC 11085 Torreyana Road, Suite 100 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHORT, Jay, M. 12985 Via Esperia Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Hwai, Wen 1318 Shadow Hills Drive San Marcos, CA 92069 / US | 03 /
FREY, Gerhard 13768 Via Cima Bella San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 17847230.4 | 22.08.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017US47950 | Priority number, date | US201662382023P | 31.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662382023 P | [2019/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018044619 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3507302 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, C07K16/28, G01N33/574, A61K39/00 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
C07K16/2863 (EP,US);
C07K16/46 (KR);
A61K47/6803 (EP,US);
A61K47/6809 (EP);
A61K47/6849 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/76 (US);
C07K16/005 (US);
C07K16/18 (EP);
C07K16/2803 (EP);
C12N15/102 (US);
C12N5/0638 (KR);
C40B30/04 (US);
G01N33/57492 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/14 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (KR);
C07K2317/52 (KR);
C07K2317/565 (KR);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2317/73 (EP);
C07K2317/92 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (KR);
G01N2333/47 (KR);
G01N2333/705 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Title | German: | BEDINGT AKTIVE POLYPEPTIDE UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG DAVON | [2019/28] | English: | CONDITIONALLY ACTIVE POLYPEPTIDES AND METHODS OF GENERATING THEM | [2019/28] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES CONDITIONNELLEMENT ACTIFS ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE GÉNÉRATION | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 04.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03105757 (GENENCOR INT [US], et al); | [X]WO2012033953 (HALOZYME INC [US], et al); | [XP]WO2016138071 (SHORT JAY M [US], et al); | [XP]WO2017078839 (BIOATLA LLC [US]); | International search | [A]US2009035836 (DATTA DEEPSHIKHA [US], et al); | [X]US2012258865 (SHORT JAY M [US], et al); | [X]US2014206596 (SHEN WEI-CHIANG [US], et al); | [X]WO2016033331 (SHORT JAY M [US], et al); | by applicant | US6329178 | US8709755 | US8921086 |