EP3503889 - INHIBITORS OF DUAL LEUCINE ZIPER (DLK) KINASE FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board Of Regents, The University Of Texas System 210 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOTH, Michael, J. 18 Thetford St. Sugar Land TX 77479 / US | 02 /
JONES, Philip 2727 Carolina Way Houston TX 77005 / US | 03 /
RAY, James 1705 Kipling St. Houston TX 77098 / US | 04 /
LIU, Gang 4807 Whitby Circle Sugar Land TX 77479 / US | 05 /
LE, Kang 5103 Manzanilla View Lane Sugar Land TX 77479 / US | 06 /
CROSS, Jason 2821 Moss Lake Lane Pearland TX 77584 / US | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Bridle, Andrew Barry Bridle Intellectual Property Ltd Unit 6F Thomas Way Lake View Business Park Sturry Road, Canterbury Kent CT3 4JZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP 5th Floor, Salisbury Square House 8, Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 17847316.1 | 28.08.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017US48941 | Priority number, date | US201662380822P | 29.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662380822 P | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018044808 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3503889 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/44, A61K31/4178, C07D401/04 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
C07D498/04 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/4985 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/5383 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/553 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP,KR);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,EA,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4985, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/5377, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN DER DUAL-LEUCIN ZIPPER (DLK)-KINASE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN | [2019/27] | English: | INHIBITORS OF DUAL LEUCINE ZIPER (DLK) KINASE FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASE | [2019/27] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE LA KINASE À DOUBLE MOTIF DE TYPE GLISSIÈRE À LEUCINES (DLK) DESTINÉS AU TRAITEMENT DE MALADIE | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 02.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009203705 (BIAGETTI MATTEO [IT], et al) [A] 28-39 * para [0478] *; | [XA]US2012322795 (BERRY ANGELA [US], et al) [X] 1-2 * para [0008], [0020], Table 1; para [0113], scheme; para [0115], Table * [A] 28-39; | [A]US2015080367 (COHEN FREDERICK [US], et al) [A] 28-39 * abstract; para [0076], Table 1; para [0174], Table A *; | [A]US2016002228 (ESTRADA ANTHONY [US], et al) [A] 28-39* para [0051]-[0054], [0326], Table 1; para [0734], Table 2 *; | [A]US2016052940 (ESTRADA ANTHONY [US], et al) [A] 28-39 * para [0061]-[0064], [0550], Table 1 * |