EP3503910 - OPTIMIZED SYNTHETIC CONSENSUS IMMUNOGENIC COMPOSITIONS TARGETING THE FOLLICLE STIMULATING HORMONE RECEPTOR (FSHR) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania 3160 Market Street, Suite 200 Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | For all designated states The Wistar Institute Of Anatomy And Biology 3601 Spruce Street Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19104 / US | For all designated states Inovio Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 660 W. Germantown Pike Suite 110 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEINER, David 717 Beacom Lane Merion, PA 19066 / US | 02 /
PERALES PUCHALT, Alfredo 1704 S. 20th Street Philadelphia, PA 19145 / US | 03 /
YAN, Jian 503 Sheffield Drive Wallingford, PA 19086 / US | 04 /
SLAGER, Anna Maria 205 Wyncote Court Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Leonard, Thomas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 17847392.2 | 29.08.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017US49186 | Priority number, date | US201662380766P | 29.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662380766 P | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018044929 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3503910 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61K38/24, C07K16/30 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
A61K38/1796 (EP,US);
A61K39/001102 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/723 (KR,US);
A61K2039/5256 (US);
A61K2039/5258 (KR);
A61K2039/53 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/54 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTE SYNTHETISCHE IMMUNOGENE KONSENSUSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN GEGEN FOLLIKELSTIMULIERENDEN HORMON-REZEPTOR (FSHR) | [2019/27] | English: | OPTIMIZED SYNTHETIC CONSENSUS IMMUNOGENIC COMPOSITIONS TARGETING THE FOLLICLE STIMULATING HORMONE RECEPTOR (FSHR) | [2019/27] | French: | COMPOSITIONS IMMUNOGÈNES CONSENSUS SYNTHÉTIQUES OPTIMISÉES CIBLANT LE RÉCEPTEUR D'HORMONE DE STIMULATION FOLLICULAIRE (FSHR) | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 21.11.2019 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 21.01.2020 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 02.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9320199 (AKZO NV [NL], et al); | [Y]WO2016073456 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]); |