EP3507733 - BI-DIRECTIONAL TRUST INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kelts, A. David 100 School Street Arlington, Massachusetts 02476 / US | For all designated states Candelas, Gustavo 5 Riverhurst Road Billerica, Massachusetts 01821 / US | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/28] | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17847644.6 | 01.09.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017US49924 | Priority number, date | US201662382688P | 01.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662382688 P | [2019/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018045326 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3507733 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/32, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/40, G06Q50/26, H04L9/32, H04L29/06, H04W12/06, G06Q30/00, G06F21/36 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
G06Q30/018 (EP,US);
G06F21/36 (EP,US);
H04L63/123 (EP,US);
H04L63/126 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2119 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Title | German: | BIDIREKTIONALER VERTRAUENSINDIKATOR | [2019/28] | English: | BI-DIRECTIONAL TRUST INDICATOR | [2019/28] | French: | INDICATEUR DE CONFIANCE BIDIRECTIONNEL | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 02.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 01.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/34] | 21.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2732427 (DOCUSIGN INC [US]) [X] 1-3,8-10,13-15 * figures 1, 2A * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0021] * [I] 4-7,11,12; | [A]US2014152547 (BOSS GREGORY J [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0031]; figures 1-7 * | International search | [Y]US2007258656 (AARABI PARHAM [CA]) [Y] 7, 8, 22, 23 * ; abstract; figure 5; paragraphs j [0023]-[0026]; [0069]; [0113]; [0118]; [0143]; [0251]. *; | [A]US2013086389 (SUWALD THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1-30 * ; entire document. *; | [A]US2013278622 (SUN JUN [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * ; entire document. *; | [Y]US2014049653 (LEONARD JON N [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * ; abstract; figures 1, 4B; I paragraphs [0006]; [0017]; [0019]; [0022]-[0023]; [0028]-[0029]; [0042]; [0055]-[0056]; [0060]. *; | [A]US2014223531 (OUTWATER CHRIS [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * ; entire document. *; | [Y]US2014270336 (ECKEL ROBERT ANDREW [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * ; abstract; figures 1, ' 4B; paragraphs [0006]; [0017]; [0019]; [0022]-[0023]; [0028]-[0029]; [0042]; [0055]-[0056]; [0060]. *; | [A]US2014333414 (KURSUN EREN [US]) [A] 1-30 * ; entire document. 1 *; | [A]US2015088778 (TSAO ADAM Y [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * ; entire document. 1 *; | [A]US2016147492 (FUGATE SUNNY JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * ; entire document. 1 *; | [Y]US2016210621 (KHAN SAL [CA]) [Y] 13, 28 * ; abstract; figures 1, 3; paragraphs [0010]; [0039]; ' [0057]; [0108]; [0124]. *; | [Y]WO2016128569 (YOTI LTD [GB]) [Y] 11, 12, 26, 27 * ; abstract; page 21, line 1-4; page 27, line 30; 1 page 29, lines 14-26; page 79, lines 10-13; page 81, lines 17-29; page 81, lines 17-29; page 94, lines 16-29; page 100, lines 4-6; figures A1A, A2, A3B, A7. *; | [PX]US2017094514 (KELTS A DAVID [US], et al) [PX] 1-30* ; entire document * | by applicant | EP2732427 |