EP3507596 - ENERGETIC PULSE CLEARING OF ENVIRONMENTALLY SENSITIVE THIN-FILM DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brewer Science Inc. 2401 Brewer Drive Rolla, MO 65401 / US | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIEDD, Ryan E. 1515 S. Fairway Avenue Springfield, Missouri 65804 / US | 02 /
FURY, Jonathan J. 2002 W. Village Terrace Avenue Springfield, Missouri 65810 / US | 03 /
HARKER, Erik 1220 Wayland St. Springfield, Missouri 65807 / US | 04 /
LANDORF, Christopher 772 W. Farm Road 68 Springfield, Missouri 65803 / US | [2019/37] |
Former [2019/28] | 01 /
GIEDD, Ryan E. 1515 S. Fairway Avenue Springfield, Missouri 65804 / US | ||
02 /
FURY, Jonathan J. 2002 W. Village Terrace Avenue Springfield, Missouri 65810 / US | |||
03 /
HARKER, Erik 712 S. McCann Avenue Springfield, Missouri 65804 / US | |||
04 /
LANDORF, Christopher 772 W. Farm Road 68 Springfield, Missouri 65803 / US | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 17847684.2 | 05.09.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017US50086 | Priority number, date | US201662383553P | 05.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662383553 P | US201762516491P | 07.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762516491 P | [2019/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018045377 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3507596 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3507596 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/12 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
G01N27/14 (EP,US);
G01N27/125 (KR);
G01N27/123 (KR);
G01N27/124 (EP,US);
G01N27/128 (KR);
G01N33/0031 (EP,US);
G01N33/0036 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGETISCHE IMPULSLÖSCHUNG VON UMWELTEMPFINDLICHEN DÜNNSCHICHTVORRICHTUNGEN | [2019/28] | English: | ENERGETIC PULSE CLEARING OF ENVIRONMENTALLY SENSITIVE THIN-FILM DEVICES | [2019/28] | French: | CLARIFICATION D'IMPULSIONS ÉNERGÉTIQUES DE DISPOSITIFS À COUCHES MINCES SENSIBLES À L'ENVIRONNEMENT | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 29.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2016025517 (GIEDD RYAN E [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0065] , [0066] , [0074] - [0080]; figure 5 * [Y] 12; | [X] - MONEREO O ET AL, "A Low-cost Approach to Low-power Gas Sensors Based on Self-Heating Effects in Large Arrays of Nanostructures", PROCEDIA ENGINEERING, (2015), vol. 120, doi:10.1016/J.PROENG.2015.08.823, ISSN 1877-7058, pages 787 - 790, XP029268567 [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.proeng.2015.08.823 | [XYI] - YIJIANG LU ET AL, "A carbon-nanotube-based sensor array for formaldehyde detection;A carbon-nanotube-based sensor array for formaldehyde detection", NANOTECHNOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, GB, (20101223), vol. 22, no. 5, doi:10.1088/0957-4484/22/5/055502, ISSN 0957-4484, page 55502, XP020204184 [X] 1,2,6-8,15 * abstract * [Y] 12 [I] 9-11,13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-4484/22/5/055502 | International search | [A]WO02095398 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [A] 1-63* See paragraphs [0011]-[0018] and figure 4. *; | [A]US2005193800 (DEBOER JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-63 * See paragraphs [0204]-[0211] and figure 7B. *; | [A]US2011269648 (SCHWARTZ ANNE M [US]) [A] 1-63 * See paragraphs [0172]-[0177] and figure 22. *; | [Y]US2016025517 (GIEDD RYAN E [US], et al) [Y] 3-6, 12-15, 17 * See paragraphs [0074]-[0078], claims 10-11 and figures 1-6. *; | [XY]US2016054258 (NICHOLAS NOLAN WALKER [US]) [X] 1-2, 7-11, 16, 18-63 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0038], claim 2 and figures 1A-1C. * [Y] 3-6, 12-15, 17 | by applicant | US2016025517 | - O. MONEREO et al., "A Low-cost Approach to Low-power Gas Sensors based on Self-Heating Effects in Large Arrays of Nanostructures", Procedia Engineering, (20150000), vol. 120, doi:10.1016/j.proeng.2015.08.823, pages 787 - 790, XP029268567 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.proeng.2015.08.823 | - "Self-heating in pulsed mode for signal quality improvement: application to carbon nanostructures-based sensors", Sensors and Actuators B: Chemical, (20151129), vol. 226, pages 254 - 265 | - YIJIANG LU et al., "A carbon-nanotube-based sensor array for formaldehyde detection", Nanotechnology, (20101223), vol. 22, no. 5, doi:10.1088/0957-4484/22/5/055502, page 55502, XP020204184 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-4484/22/5/055502 |