EP3450417 - COATING METHOD, COATING FILM, AND TURBINE SHROUD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Aero Engines, Ltd. 1200, Higashi-tanaka Komaki-shi, Aichi 485-0826 / JP | [2021/07] |
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Aero Engines, Ltd. 1200, Higashitanaka Komaki-shi Aichi 485-0826 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Mineaki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
KURIMURA, Takayuki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
TAMUGI, Azusa c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES AERO ENGINES, LTD. 1200 Higashi-tanaka Komaki-shi Aichi 485-0826 / JP | 04 /
HANADA, Tadayuki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES AERO ENGINES, LTD. 1200 Higashi-tanaka Komaki-shi Aichi 485-0826 / JP | [2021/07] |
Former [2019/10] | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Mineaki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | ||
02 /
KURIMURA, Takayuki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | |||
03 /
TAMUGI, Azusa c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES AERO ENGINES LTD. 1200 Higashi-tanaka Komaki-shi Aichi 485-0826 / JP | |||
04 /
HANADA, Tadayuki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES AERO ENGINES LTD. 1200 Higashi-tanaka Komaki-shi Aichi 485-0826 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2021/08] |
Former [2019/10] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17848468.9 | 01.08.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017JP27843 | Priority number, date | JP20160175520 | 08.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016175520 | [2019/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018047523 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3450417 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3450417 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/89, C23C4/02, F01D5/28, F01D9/02, F01D11/02, F01D25/00, F02C7/00 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
C04B41/89 (EP,US);
C04B35/80 (US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5031 (US);
C04B41/52 (EP);
C04B41/87 (US);
C23C4/02 (EP);
F01D11/122 (EP);
C04B2111/00405 (EP);
F01D5/28 (US);
F05D2240/11 (EP);
F05D2250/63 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B35/803, C04B41/009, C04B35/10 (EP);
C04B35/803, C04B41/009, C04B35/18 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4527, C04B41/5042 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4539, C04B41/4547, C04B41/5031 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4539, C04B41/4547, C04B41/5031, C04B41/5042, C04B41/522 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4539, C04B41/4547, C04B41/5031, C04B41/5042, C04B41/522, C04B41/526 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN, BESCHICHTUNGSFILM UND TURBINENUMMANTELUNG | [2019/10] | English: | COATING METHOD, COATING FILM, AND TURBINE SHROUD | [2019/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT, FILM DE REVÊTEMENT, ET CARÉNAGE DE TURBINE | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2018 | Translation filed | 29.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 04.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.08.2017 | AL | 24.02.2021 | AT | 24.02.2021 | CY | 24.02.2021 | CZ | 24.02.2021 | DK | 24.02.2021 | EE | 24.02.2021 | ES | 24.02.2021 | FI | 24.02.2021 | HR | 24.02.2021 | IT | 24.02.2021 | LT | 24.02.2021 | LV | 24.02.2021 | MC | 24.02.2021 | MK | 24.02.2021 | NL | 24.02.2021 | PL | 24.02.2021 | RO | 24.02.2021 | RS | 24.02.2021 | SE | 24.02.2021 | SI | 24.02.2021 | SK | 24.02.2021 | SM | 24.02.2021 | BG | 24.05.2021 | NO | 24.05.2021 | GR | 25.05.2021 | IS | 24.06.2021 | PT | 24.06.2021 | IE | 01.08.2021 | LU | 01.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 01.08.2017 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IE | 01.08.2021 | ||
LU | 01.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IE | 01.08.2021 | ||
LU | 01.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IE | 01.08.2021 | ||
LU | 01.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016129591 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND AERO ENGINES LTD [JP]) [A] 10-19* the whole document * | International search | [YA]JPH07310106 (NIPPON TUNGSTEN, et al) [Y] 1, 7, 9 * , paragraph [0014] (Family: none) * [A] 4-6; | [YA]JPH0967662 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 2-3, 8 * , paragraph [0021] (Family: none) * [A] 4-6; | [A]JP2002266603 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-9* , paragraph [0036] & US 2002/0127111 A1 paragraph [0050] & EP 1239058 A2 & CA 2372016 A1 *; | [YA]JP2008247722 (IHI CORP) [Y] 1-3, 7-9 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0026] to [0031], [0057] (Family: none) * [A] 4-6; | [A]WO2016129591 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND AERO ENGINES LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * , claims; paragraphs [0026] to [0028], [0057] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH10330958 |