EP3447274 - ELECTRIC POWER-ASSISTED LIQUID-PROPELLANT ROCKET PROPULSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/09] | ELECTRIC POWER-ASSISTED LIQUID FUEL ROCKET PROPULSION SYSTEM | ||
[2021/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IHI Corporation 1-1 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAGUCHI, Hiroyuki c/o IHI Corporation 1-1 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Hatsuo c/o IHI Corporation 1-1 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 03 /
ISHIKAWA, Yasuhiro c/o IHI Corporation 1-1 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 04 /
MIYOSHI, Koichi c/o IHI Corporation 1-1 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 17850473.4 | 13.04.2017 | [2019/09] | WO2017JP15074 | Priority number, date | JP20160179369 | 14.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016179369 | [2019/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018051566 | Date: | 22.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447274 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3447274 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F02K9/48, F02K9/95 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
F02K9/48 (EP,RU,US);
F02K9/44 (US);
F02K9/46 (EP,US);
F02K9/50 (US);
F02K9/56 (US);
F02K9/563 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH ANTRIEBUNTERSTÜTZES FLÜSSIGKEITSRAKETENANTRIEBSSYSTEM | [2021/24] | English: | ELECTRIC POWER-ASSISTED LIQUID-PROPELLANT ROCKET PROPULSION SYSTEM | [2021/24] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION DE FUSÉE À ERGOLS LIQUIDE ASSISTÉ PAR ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/24] |
Former [2019/09] | ELEKTRISCH ANTRIEBUNTERSTÜTZES FLÜSSIGBRENNSTOFFRAKETENANTRIEBSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2019/09] | ELECTRIC POWER-ASSISTED LIQUID FUEL ROCKET PROPULSION SYSTEM | ||
Former [2019/09] | SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION DE FUSÉE À COMBUSTIBLE LIQUIDE ASSISTÉ PAR ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2018 | Translation filed | 21.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 08.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2017 | AL | 16.06.2021 | AT | 16.06.2021 | CY | 16.06.2021 | CZ | 16.06.2021 | DK | 16.06.2021 | EE | 16.06.2021 | ES | 16.06.2021 | FI | 16.06.2021 | HR | 16.06.2021 | IT | 16.06.2021 | LT | 16.06.2021 | LV | 16.06.2021 | MC | 16.06.2021 | MK | 16.06.2021 | NL | 16.06.2021 | PL | 16.06.2021 | RO | 16.06.2021 | RS | 16.06.2021 | SE | 16.06.2021 | SI | 16.06.2021 | SK | 16.06.2021 | SM | 16.06.2021 | BG | 16.09.2021 | NO | 16.09.2021 | GR | 17.09.2021 | IS | 16.10.2021 | PT | 18.10.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 13.04.2017 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 13.04.2017 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2585626 (ALLAN CHILTON) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, line 21 - line 31; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US3077073 (KUHRT WESLEY A) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 39; figure 1 *; | [A]US5644920 (LAK TIBOR I [US], et al) [A] 3 * column 1, line 37 - column 4, line 41; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2001015063 (MAEDING CHRIS UDO [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0030]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2008264372 (SISK DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 5* paragraph [0052] *; | [A]US2015354503 (VUILLAMY DIDIER [FR], et al) [A] 2 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US3077073 (KUHRT WESLEY A) [Y] 1-5 * , column 1, line 10 to column 2, line 39; figures (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH0445200U (Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.) [Y] 5* , specification, page 3, line 13 to page 4, line 6; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH09184452 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP) [Y] 3 * , paragraphs [0010] to [0020]; fig. 1 & US 5644920 A column 2, line 28 to column 4, line 41; figures & DE 19632801 A1 & FR 2739172 A1 *; | [Y]JP2001193565 (ASTRIUM GMBH) [Y] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0012] to [0013]; fig. 1 & US 2001/0015063 A1 paragraph [0030]; fig. 2 & DE 19958310 A1 & FR 2801936 A1 *; | [Y]JP2006118443 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP) [Y] 5 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0002] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2016510378 (Snecma) [Y] 2-3 * , paragraphs [0020] to [0029]; fig. 1 & US 2015/0354503 A1 paragraphs [0027] to [0036]; fig. 1 & WO 2014/108635 A1 & FR 3000996 A1 & RU 2015133532 A * |